blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0993358 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0993358



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 95
21.05.2003 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
06.06.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.04.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
11.04.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
11.04.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
25.01.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
10.01.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
18.12.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
18.12.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.12.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 11
19.10.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
12.10.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
17.09.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
21.08.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
21.08.2001 Description Search / examination 3
21.08.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.08.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.04.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
26.04.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
24.12.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
23.11.1999 Priority document Search / examination 14
19.11.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
11.11.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
11.11.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 13
09.06.1999 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
09.06.1999 Claims International Searching Authority 2
09.06.1999 Description International Searching Authority 6
09.06.1999 Drawings International Searching Authority 3