blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0993358


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.05.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  09.07.2003  [2003/28]
31.05.2002 (Expected) grant published on  17.07.2002  [2002/29]
30.04.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.04.2002 Renewal fee
22.01.2002 Communication of intention to grant
22.01.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.12.2001 Communication of intention to grant
25.10.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn
18.10.2001 Examination report or reply
08.10.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn
14.09.2001 Change - representative published on  31.10.2001 [2001/44]
08.05.2001 Renewal fee
27.04.2001 First examination report
23.04.2001 Examination report or reply
03.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
03.03.2000 Request for examination filed published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
25.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
13.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
17.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
16.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.1999 PCT data prior to European publication