blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0993358
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4356118BGlobal Dossier 04.11.2009B2
JP2002509499 26.03.2002A
Priority number Date
DE19819761 04.05.1998
EP9902676 21.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0993358Global Dossier 17.07.2002B1
EP0993358 19.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19819761 04.05.1998
EP9902676 21.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT220604T 15.08.2002T
Priority number Date
DE19819761 04.05.1998
EP9902676 21.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59902022D 22.08.2002D1
Priority number Date
DE19819761 04.05.1998
DE59902022 21.04.1999
EP9902676 21.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK0993358T 04.11.2002T3
Priority number Date
DE19819761 04.05.1998
EP9902676 21.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6416311 09.07.2002B1
Priority number Date
DE19819761 04.05.1998
EP9902676 21.04.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9956928Global Dossier 11.11.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19819761 04.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1105003C 09.04.2003C
CN1266394 13.09.2000A
Priority number Date
DE19819761 04.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19819761 31.05.2000C2
DE19819761 18.11.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19819761 04.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2180301T 01.02.2003T3
Priority number Date
DE19819761 04.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100340917B 20.06.2002B1
KR20010014171 26.02.2001A
Priority number Date
DE19819761 04.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW458882B 11.10.2001B
Priority number Date
DE19819761 04.05.1998