Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993358

EP0993358 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SEPARATING A MOULDED SUBSTRATE FROM A STAMPING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.05.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.05.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.07.2003  [2003/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JENOPTIK Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 1
07743 Jena / DE
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / SPRINGER, Alf
Im Plotz 14
D-07751 Milda / DE
02 / REUTHER, Frank
Debrastrasse 18
D-07407 Rudolstadt / DE
03 / MÜLLER, Lutz
Felix-Auerbach-Strasse 18
D-07747 Jena / DE
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Oehmke, Volker
Patentanwälte Oehmke & Kollegen
Neugasse 13
07743 Jena / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/44]Oehmke, Volker, Dipl.-Math.
Patentanwälte Oehmke & Kollegen, Neugasse 13
07743 Jena / DE
Application number, filing date99922117.921.04.1999
[2000/16]
WO1999EP02676
Priority number, dateDE199811976104.05.1998         Original published format: DE 19819761
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9956928
Date:11.11.1999
Language:DE
[1999/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993358
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1999
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993358
Date:17.07.2002
Language:DE
[2002/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B29C37/00, B29C59/02, B29C33/46, G11B7/26
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR TRENNUNG EINES GEFORMTEN SUBSTRATES VON EINEM PRÄGEWERKZEUG[2000/16]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SEPARATING A MOULDED SUBSTRATE FROM A STAMPING TOOL[2000/16]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE SEPARER UN SUBSTRAT MODELE D'UN OUTIL D'ESTAMPAGE[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase24.12.1999National basic fee paid 
24.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
24.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
26.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2002Fee for grant paid
10.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.04.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0664168  (LORRAINE LAMINAGE [FR]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE19648844  (JENOPTIK JENA GMBH [DE], et al) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH06293965
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 095, no. 001, [A] 1-8 * abstract *
by applicantDE19648844
 DE19509452