Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1103664

EP1103664 - DEVICE FOR THE COUPLING OF EXCAVATOR TEETH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 30.05.2007  [2007/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
METALOGENIA, S.A.
Paseo San Juan Bautista de la Salle, 40 08330 Premia de Mar
Barcelona / ES
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
METALOGENIA, S.A.
Paseo San Juan Bautista de la Salle, 40
08330 Premia de Mar, Barcelona / ES
Inventor(s)01 / PALLAS MORENO, Jorge
Paseo de la Riera, 7 (El Masnou)
E-08320 Barcelona / ES
02 / PUEYO MOLINA, Javier
Calle Pacifico 53, 1o-1
E-08023 Barcelona / ES
03 / SANCHEZ GUISADO, Fermin
Gran Via 229, 2o-2
E-08330 Premia de Mar / ES
04 / LOPEZ ALMENDROS, José
Calle Mossen Juliana, 32
E-08027 Barcelona / ES
 [2001/22]
Representative(s)Primo de Rivera y Urquijo, Jose A.
General Martinez Campos, 51
28010 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [2003/46]Primo de Rivera y Urquijo, Jose Antonio
General Martinez Campos, 51
28010 Madrid / ES
Former [2001/22]Duran Moya, Carlos
DURAN-CORRETJER, S.L., Paseo de Gracia, 101
08008 Barcelona / ES
Application number, filing date99922196.303.06.1999
[2001/22]
WO1999ES00160
Priority number, dateES1998000125708.06.1998         Original published format: ES 9801257
[2001/22]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9964686
Date:16.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1103664
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.1999
[2001/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1103664
Date:17.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:ES16.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:E02F9/28
[2001/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/22]
Extension statesAL29.11.2000
LT29.11.2000
LV29.11.2000
MK29.11.2000
RO29.11.2000
SI29.11.2000
TitleGerman:KUPPLUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN BAGGERZAHN[2001/22]
English:DEVICE FOR THE COUPLING OF EXCAVATOR TEETH[2001/22]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR L'ACCOUPLEMENT DE DENTS D'EXCAVATEUR[2001/22]
Entry into regional phase29.11.2000Translation filed 
29.11.2000National basic fee paid 
29.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
29.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/22]
12.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
08.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.2004Fee for grant paid
05.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03001374.2  / EP1314826
Opposition(s)20.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
CY17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
NL17.03.2004
IE03.06.2004
LU03.06.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
[2007/22]
Former [2006/13]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
NL17.03.2004
IE03.06.2004
LU03.06.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
Former [2005/24]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
IE03.06.2004
LU03.06.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
Former [2005/23]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
LU03.06.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
Former [2005/18]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
Former [2005/11]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
Former [2005/01]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
Former [2004/44]AT17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
Former [2004/43]AT17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI17.03.2004
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5561925  (LIVESAY RICHARD E [US]);
 [Y]US5456029  (CORNELIUS ERWIN D [US]);
 [Y]ES419646  (POCLAIN SA [FR]);
 [A]US4625439  (JOHANSSON ARNE [SE], et al);
 [A]US3520224  (HENSLEY RUSTON C, et al)