EP1084426 - MARINE SEISMIC ACQUISITION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
IT
NL
WesternGeco Seismic Holdings Limited Citco Building PO Box 662 Roadtown Tortola / VG | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/32] | For:DE
IT
NL
WesternGeco Seismic Holdings Limited Citco Building PO Box 662 Roadtown, Tortola / VG | ||
For:FR
SERVICES PETROLIERS SCHLUMBERGER 42, rue Saint-Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2005/23] | For:DE
IT
NL
WesternGeco Seismic Holdings Limited Citco Building PO Box 662 Roadtown, Tortola / VG | ||
For:FR
SERVICES PETROLIERS SCHLUMBERGER 42, rue Saint-Dominique F-75007 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2001/12] | For:DE
IT
NL
SCHLUMBERGER HOLDINGS LIMITED P.O. Box 71, Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | ||
For:FR
SERVICES PETROLIERS SCHLUMBERGER 42, rue Saint-Dominique F-75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OZBEK, Ali 17 Falkner Close Milton, Cambridge CB4 6EF / GB | 02 /
MARTIN, James 22 Margett Street Cottenham, Cambridge CB4 4QY / GB | 03 /
LUNDE, Nils Kirkeveien 65B N-1344 Haslum / NO | 04 /
BITTLESTON, Simon, Hastings Bjornsvikveien 27 N-1312 Slependen / NO | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Suckling, Andrew Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Suckling, Andrew Michael, et al Marks & Clerk 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [2004/09] | Suckling, Andrew Michael, et al Marks & Clerk, Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [2001/12] | Stoole, Brian David Geco-Prakla Technical Services Inc, Patent Department, Schlumberger House, Buckingham Gate Gatwick, West Sussex RH6 ONZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99922319.1 | 14.05.1999 | [2001/12] | WO1999GB01544 | Priority number, date | GB19980010706 | 20.05.1998 Original published format: GB 9810706 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9960421 | Date: | 25.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1084426 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1084426 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/20, G01V1/36 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
G01V1/364 (EP,US);
G01V1/201 (EP,US);
G01V2210/3246 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL [2001/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERFASSUNG SEISMISCHER MEERESDATEN | [2001/12] | English: | MARINE SEISMIC ACQUISITION SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2001/12] | French: | SYSTEME D'ACQUISITION DE DONNEES DE PROSPECTION SISMIQUE MARINE ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT | [2001/12] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 07.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29] | Request for further processing for: | 24.12.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 17.12.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.01.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 10.08.2005 | DE | 11.11.2005 | [2009/01] |
Former [2006/36] | DE | 11.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4744064 (HUGHES PHILIP A [US]) [Y] 1,6,9 * column 1, line 15 - line 21 * * column 4, line 55 - column 6, line 39; figures 1A-1E *; | [A]GB2180341 (AMOCO CORP) [A] 1,6,9 * page 2, column 2, line 93 - page 3, column 1, line 16 * * page 4, column 2, line 76 - line 96; figure 5 * | [Y] - BEDENBENDER J.W. ET AL., "Electroacoustic characteristics of marine seismic streamers", GEOPHYSISCS, (197012), vol. 35, no. 6, pages 1054 - 1072, XP002115037 [Y] 1,6,9 * page 1065, column 1, line 16 - page 1066, column 2, line 6; figure 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1190/1.1440142 | [A] - SCHOENBERGER M. AND J.F. MIFSUD, "Hydrophone streamer noise", GEOPHYSICS, (197412), vol. 39, no. 6, pages 781 - 793, XP002115038 [A] 1,2 * page 787, column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 22 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1190/1.1440466 | [A] - FROST O L III, "An algorithm for linearly constrained adaptive array processing", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, AUG. 1972, USA, vol. 60, no. 8, ISSN 0018-9219, pages 926 - 935, XP002113432 [A] 1,3-5 * page 926, column 1, line 1 - line 30; figure 1 * |