Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1034468

EP1034468 - FINGERLESS GLOVE FOR INTERACTING WITH DATA PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.07.2005
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.08.2005  [2005/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / VANCE, Scott
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / MIGACHYOV, Larisa
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
03 / FU, Wayne
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
04 / HAJJAR, Ira
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Deguelle, Wilhelmus H. G. , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Deguelle, Wilhelmus Hendrikus Gerardus , et al
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date99922450.414.06.1999
[2000/37]
WO1999IB01095
Priority number, dateUS1998010752730.06.1998         Original published format: US 107527
[2000/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0000883
Date:06.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1034468
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2000
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1034468
Date:01.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE06.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/02, G06K11/18
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/37]
TitleGerman:FINGERLOSE HANDSCHUHE ZUR INTERAKTION MIT EINEM DATENVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM[2000/37]
English:FINGERLESS GLOVE FOR INTERACTING WITH DATA PROCESSING SYSTEM[2000/37]
French:GANT A DOIGTS DECOUVERTS INTERAGISSANT AVEC UN SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES[2000/37]
Entry into regional phase30.03.2000National basic fee paid 
06.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
06.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
23.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2004Fee for grant paid
25.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]US5554032  (TROUDET FARIDEH [US]);
 [A]US5581484  (PRINCE KEVIN R [US])