Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1101930

EP1101930 - FUEL FEED DEVICE AND FUEL PRESSURE REGULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.02.2005  [2005/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HIRAIWA, Masaru, Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / KANAMARU, Shigeki, Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-831 / JP
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99922493.426.05.1999
[2001/21]
WO1999JP02765
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0073646
Date:07.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1101930
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2000
[2001/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.12.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2004
ClassificationInternational:F02M37/08
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/21]
TitleGerman:BRENNSTOFFZUFUHR UND BRENNSTOFFDRUCKREGLER[2001/21]
English:FUEL FEED DEVICE AND FUEL PRESSURE REGULATOR[2001/21]
French:DISPOSITIF D'AMENEE DE CARBURANT ET REGULATEUR DE PRESSION DE CARBURANT[2001/21]
Entry into regional phase20.02.2001Translation filed 
20.02.2001National basic fee paid 
20.02.2001Search fee paid 
20.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
20.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/41]
01.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/08]
15.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
19.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]FR2725244  (MARWAL SYSTEMS [FR]) [X] 1,4 * page 3, line 10 - page 7, line 9; figure 4 * [Y] 2,3;
 [Y]DE19709446  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 2,3 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 63; figures 1,2 *;
 [YX]US5265644  (TUCKEY CHARLES H [US]) [Y] 1 * column 7, line 7 - column 8, line 35; figures 3-5 * [X] 4;
 [YX]US3824974  (LA FLAME F, et al) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 24; figures 1,4 * [X] 4;
 [A]US5765535  (RADERMACHER BERNHARD [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 18; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0754483  (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 4; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5797374  (MINAGAWA KAZUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 10; figures 1,2 *
International search[X]JPH08246973  (NIPPON DENSO CO);
 [A]JPH0311146  (AISAN IND)