Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1078247

EP1078247 - IMPROVED APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR CARRYING OUT ELECTROCHEMILUMINESCENCE TEST MEASUREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.08.2008
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BioVeris Corporation
16020 Industrial Drive
Gaithersburg, Maryland 20877 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/39]For all designated states
BioVeris Corporation
16020 Industrial Drive
Gaithersburg Maryland 20877 / US
Former [2001/09]For all designated states
IGEN International, Inc.
16020 Industrial Drive
Gaithersburg, MD 20877 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WOHLSTADTER, Jacob, N.
9905 Gable Ridge Terrace
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
02 / ZHANG, Jue
213 Ross Drive S.W.
Vienna, VA 22180 / US
03 / GAMBREL, David, R.
10928 Stuart Mill Road
Oakton, VA 22124 / US
04 / IVANOV, Sergey
21207 Virginia Pine Terrace
Germantown, MD 20876 / US
05 / LILJESTRAND, John
11025 Nicholas Place
Ijamsville, MD 21754 / US
06 / DAVIS, Charles, Quentin
931 Beacon Square Court 28
Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US
 [2001/09]
Representative(s)MacLean, Martin Robert , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/39]MacLean, Martin Robert , et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Former [2001/09]Schlich, George William , et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date99922921.411.05.1999
[2001/09]
WO1999US10279
Priority number, dateUS1998007632511.05.1998         Original published format: US 76325
[2001/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9958962
Date:18.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1078247
Date:28.02.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999
[2001/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.11.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/66
[2001/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/09]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE VORRICHTUNG UND METHODE ZUM DURCHFÜHREN VON ELEKTROCHEMILUMINESZENZ-TESTMESSUNGEN[2001/09]
English:IMPROVED APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR CARRYING OUT ELECTROCHEMILUMINESCENCE TEST MEASUREMENTS[2001/09]
French:APPAREIL AMELIORE ET PROCEDES POUR PRENDRE DES MESURES TESTS D'ELECTROCHIMIOLUMINESCENCE[2001/09]
Entry into regional phase08.11.2000National basic fee paid 
08.11.2000Search fee paid 
08.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
08.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
08.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/09]
06.02.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.03.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/38]
29.04.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
30.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
30.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200810   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0500305  (TDK CORP [JP]) [X] 29 * column 7, line 51 - column 8, line 26; figure 1 * [Y] 1-6;
 [Y]JPH02137275  ;
 [A]JPS60117503  ;
 [A]JPH0877832  ;
 [PA]JPH10251018  ;
 [XAY]JPH0634548  ;
 [A]DE19521349  (HORIBA LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 11 *;
 [XAY]EP0791821  (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [X] 19-21,23-26,29,33,35,36 * page 11, line 16 - page 12, line 11 * * page 6, lines 1,2 * [A] 8-10 [Y] 1-4,30-32,34;
 [A]DE4429857  (BALLUFF GEBHARD FEINMECH [DE]) [A] 25,64 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900813), vol. 014, no. 374, Database accession no. (E - 0964), & JP02137275 A 19900525 (NEC CORP) [Y] 1-6,30-32,34 * abstract *
 [YA]  - COUTAL C ET AL, "Fabrication and characterization of ITO thin films deposited by excimer laser evaporation", THIN SOLID FILMS, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (19961115), vol. 288, no. 1, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 248 - 253, XP004049558 [Y] 5 * abstract * [A] 6

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-6090(96)08824-4
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1985, no. 31, Database accession no. 1985-187744, XP002198855 & JPS60117503 A 19850625 (MATSUSHITA ELEC IND CO LTD) [A] 4,5 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 22, Database accession no. 1996-214057, XP002198856 & JPH0877832 A 19960322 (SHOKUBAI KASEI KOGYO KK) [A] 4 * abstract *
 [PA]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 49, Database accession no. 1998-571541, XP002198857 & JPH10251018 A 19980922 (NISSAN CHEM IND LTD) [PA] 4 * abstract *
 [XAY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940512), vol. 018, no. 250, Database accession no. (P - 1736), & JP06034548 A 19940208 (OMRON CORP) [X] 7,29 * abstract * [A] 44 [Y] 1-4,8-10
 [Y]  - "Shift of electrochemiluminescence spectra in the system of diphenyl styryl pyrazoline with active electrolyte", INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, Database accession no. 1024090, XP002213976 [Y] 8-10 * abstract *
    [] - OPTIKA I SPEKTROSKOPIYA, JULY 1976, USSR, vol. 41, no. 1, ISSN 0030-4034, pages 147 - 149
International search[A]US5538687  (KOTZAN HOLGER [DE], et al);
 [A]US5624637  (GHAED ALI [US], et al);
 [A]US5720922  (GHAED ALI [US], et al);
 [A]US5744367  (TALLEY DAVID B [US], et al);
 [A]US5746974  (MASSEY RICHARD J [US], et al)