EP1095323 - THERMOSTATIC MIXING VALVE WITH SEQUENTIAL MANUAL CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCO CORPORATION 21001 Van Born Road Taylor, MI 48180 / US | [2001/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNAPP, Francesco Via Giacomo Leopardi 28 I-27061 Cava Manara / IT | [2002/15] |
Former [2001/18] | 01 /
KNAPP, Alfons Klockstrasse 15 D-88400 Biberach an der Riss / DE | Representative(s) | Oppermann, Ewald Oppermann & Oppermann Patentanwälte Am Wiesengrund 35 63075 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Oppermann, Ewald, Dipl.-Ing. Oppermann & Oppermann Patentanwälte Am Wiesengrund 35 63075 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 99922922.2 | 11.05.1999 | [2001/18] | WO1999US10280 | Priority number, date | IT1998TO00393 | 12.05.1998 Original published format: IT TO980393 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9959045 | Date: | 18.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1095323 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.11.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/13 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
G05D23/1353 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, GB, IT [2001/18] | Title | German: | THERMOSTATISCHES MISCHVENTIL MIT SEQUENTIELLER HANDBEDIENUNG | [2002/16] | English: | THERMOSTATIC MIXING VALVE WITH SEQUENTIAL MANUAL CONTROL | [2001/18] | French: | MELANGEUR THERMOSTATIQUE AVEC COMMANDE SEQUENTIELLE MANUELLE | [2001/18] |
Former [2001/18] | THEMOSTATISCHES MISCHVENTIL MIT SEQUENTIELLER HANDBEDIENUNG | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2000 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.08.2000 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 27.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/34] | 19.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.06.2001 | 31.05.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9530939 (GEVIPI AG) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US1932404 ; | [A]US4475684 ; | [A]US2910242 ; | [A]US4923115 ; | [A]US5535943 ; | [A]US5340018 ; | [A]US4327758 |