Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1078448

EP1078448 - DRIVING CIRCUIT FOR SWITCHED RELUCTANCE MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.05.2004
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.07.2004  [2004/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baldor Electric Company
5711 R.S. Boreham Jr. Street
Fort Smith, AR 72908 / US
[2002/04]
Former [2001/09]For all designated states
Tridelta Industries, Inc.
7333 Corporate Boulevard
Mentor, Ohio 44060 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PENGOV, Wayne, A.
13405 Chardon Windsor Road
Chardon, OH 44024 / US
 [2001/09]
Representative(s)Kinzebach, Werner , et al
Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/09]Kinzebach, Werner, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date99923066.714.05.1999
[2001/09]
WO1999US10682
Priority number, dateUS1998008003315.05.1998         Original published format: US 80033
[2001/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9960695
Date:25.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1078448
Date:28.02.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999
[2001/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H02P7/05
[2001/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/09]
TitleGerman:ANSTEUERSCHALTUNG FÜR ELEKTRONISCH KOMMUTIERTE RELUKTANZMASCHINEN[2001/09]
English:DRIVING CIRCUIT FOR SWITCHED RELUCTANCE MACHINES[2001/09]
French:CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE POUR MACHINES A RELUCTANCE COMMUTEE[2001/09]
Entry into regional phase10.11.2000National basic fee paid 
10.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
10.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
10.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/09]
02.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/28]
06.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0599334  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,7,11,12,19,24,30,31 * abstract * * column 3, line 54 - column 5, line 20; figures 2-5 *;
 [A]WO8901260  (UNIV DUNDEE [GB]) [A] 1,7,11,12,19,24,30,31 * abstract * * page 3, line 10 - page 5, line 11; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5703456  (COX KARMEN D [US]) [A] 1,7,11,12,19,24,30,31 * column 7, line 13 - column 10, line 64; figures 4A,4B *;
 [A]US4684867  (MILLER TIMOTHY J E [US], et al) [A] 1,7,11,12,19,24,30,31 * column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 58; figures 3-6 *;
 [DA]US5115181  (SOOD PRADEEP K [US]) [DA] 1 * column A * * column 4, line 33 - column 6, line 11; figures 1A,1B,2,3,6A,6B *;
 [DA]US5084662  (PALANIAPPAN RASAPPA [US], et al) [DA] 1,32 * column A * * column 3, line 65 - column 5, line 9; figures 4A,4B,5A-F *