EP1086583 - EPG AND ADVERTISEMENT ON A REMOTE CONTROL DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TV Compass, Inc. 3220 West 98th Street Evergreen Park Illinois 60805 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states TV Compass Inc. 3220 West 98th Street Evergreen Park Illinois 60805 / US | ||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Evolve Products, Inc. 152 Technology Drive No. 200 Irvine, CA 92618 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DARBEE, Paul, V. 9852 Brentwood Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US | 02 /
THOMPSON, John, R. 5 Amador Newport Coast, CA 92657 / US | 03 /
THOMPSON, Brandt, J. 5 Amador Newport Coast, CA 92657 / US | 04 /
O'DONNELL, Frank, A. 9112 Vista Greens Way, No. 102 Summerlin, NV 89134 / US | [2001/19] |
Former [2001/18] | 01 /
DARBEE, Paul, V. 9852 Brentwood Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US | ||
02 /
THOMPSON, John, R. P.O. Box 717 La Quinta, CA 92253 / US | |||
03 /
THOMPSON, Brandt, J. 5 Amador Newport Coast, CA 92657 / US | |||
04 /
O'DONNELL, Frank, A. 9112 Vista Greens Way, No. 102 Summerlin, NV 89134 / US | |||
Former [2001/13] | 01 /
DARBEE, Paul, V. 9852 Brentwood Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US | ||
02 /
THOMPSON, John, R. P.O. Box 717 La Quinta, CA 92253 / US | |||
03 /
THOMPSON, Brandt, J. 8 Anjou Newport Coast, CA 92657 / US | |||
04 /
O'DONNELL, Frank, A. 9112 Vista Greens Way, No. 102 Summerlin, NV 89134 / US | Representative(s) | Brophy, David Timothy, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Brophy, David Timothy, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2010/31] | Kelly, Madeleine, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2008/28] | Brophy, David Timothy, et al F.R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2005/03] | Matschnig, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Siebensterngasse 54, Postfach 252 1071 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2001/13] | Matschnig, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. Siebensterngasse 54 1070 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 99923142.6 | 14.05.1999 | [2001/13] | WO1999US10842 | Priority number, date | US19980080315 | 15.05.1998 Original published format: US 80315 | [2001/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9960782 | Date: | 25.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1086583 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.11.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/44, H04N7/16, H04N5/445 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
G06F3/147 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
G09F27/00 (EP,US);
H04H60/14 (EP,US);
H04H60/27 (EP,US);
H04H60/31 (EP,US);
H04H60/72 (EP,US);
H04L67/561 (EP,US);
H04N21/25891 (EP,US);
H04N21/41265 (EP,US);
H04N21/42204 (EP,US);
H04N21/42209 (EP,US);
H04N21/44222 (EP,US);
H04N21/4667 (EP,US);
H04N21/482 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
H04N7/104 (EP,US);
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
H04N7/17309 (EP,US);
H04N7/17318 (EP,US);
H01H9/0235 (EP,US);
H04B1/202 (EP,US);
H04H2201/70 (EP,US);
H04H60/45 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/13] | H04N5/44, H04N7/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/13] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE PROGRAMMFÜHRUNG UND WERBUNG AUF EINEM FERNBEDIENUNGSDISPLAY | [2001/13] | English: | EPG AND ADVERTISEMENT ON A REMOTE CONTROL DISPLAY | [2001/13] | French: | GUIDE ELECTRONIQUE DE PROGRAMMES ET PUBLICITE SUR UN AFFICHAGE COMMANDE A DISTANCE | [2001/13] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2000 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 14.02.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 04.02.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/27] | 28.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/27] | Appeal following examination | 01.04.2010 | Appeal received No. T1453/10 | 14.06.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.04.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | EP10181239.4 / EP2278795 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   07.09.2010 | 31.05.2014 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4774511 (RUMBOLT ROBIN B [US], et al) [Y] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 38 - line 47 * * column 3, line 5 - line 9; figure 1 *; | [YA]US5545857 (LEE SANG-SU [KR], et al) [Y] 27 * abstract * * column 1, line 30 - line 38 * * column 4, line 23 - line 56; figures 4a,4b * [A] 20,58; | [A]EP0744839 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-4,9,10,12,17-20,27,63 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 9 * * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 40; figure 3 ** column 6, line 49 - column 7, line 20; figure 7 *; | [A]WO9723960 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-4,9,10,17-20,27,63 * abstract * * page 3, line 9 - page 4, line 5 * * page 6, line 19 - page 7, line 12; figures 2,3 * * page 15, line 2 - page 21, line 2; figures 12-14 *; | [XAY]WO9816062 (CHANG ALLEN [US]) [X] 2,10,17,18,63 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - page 5, line 17; figures 1-4 * * page 6, line 15 - page 7, line 14; figure 6 * [A] 1,3,4,9,12,19,20,24,27,32,33,42,45,46,50,60,61 [Y] 1,27 | International search | [X]US5282028 (JOHNSON LEE R [US], et al); | [Y]US5410326 (GOLDSTEIN STEVEN W [US]); | [Y]US5603078 (HENDERSON ANDRE D [US], et al); | [Y]US5650831 (FARWELL RANDALL [US]); | [Y]WO9733434 (ACTV INC [US], et al); | [X]US5710605 (NELSON RICKEY D [US]); | [AP]US5761601 (NEMIROFSKY FRANK R [US], et al); | [YP]US5822123 (DAVIS BRUCE [US], et al); | [AP]US5828945 (KLOSTERMAN BRIAN LEE [US]); | [YP]US5883680 (NYKERK MICHAEL [US]); | [XE]US5940073 (KLOSTERMAN BRIAN LEE [US], et al) |