EP1083977 - METHOD AND APPARATUS OF A FLUID FILTERING SYSTEM WITH COMPRESSED BLOCKING AREA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harvard Corporation Highway 14 North Evansville, WI 53556 / US | [2001/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORGAN, Dennis, R. 23940 Millwood Road Howard, OH 43028 / US | 02 /
GRYDER, Edd D. Harvard Corporation, Highway 14 North Evansville, WI 53556 / US | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99923272.1 | 20.05.1999 | [2001/12] | WO1999US11253 | Priority number, date | US19980082734 | 21.05.1998 Original published format: US 82734 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9959691 | Date: | 25.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1083977 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1083977 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01D29/07 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
B01D29/073 (EP,US);
B01D29/54 (EP,US);
B01D2201/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG EINES FILTERS MIT EINER KOMPRIMIERTEN SPERRZONE | [2001/12] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS OF A FLUID FILTERING SYSTEM WITH COMPRESSED BLOCKING AREA | [2001/12] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR SYSTEME DE FILTRAGE DE FLUIDES A ZONE DE BLOCAGE COMPRIMEE | [2001/12] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 03.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.09.2003 | BE | 24.09.2003 | CH | 24.09.2003 | CY | 24.09.2003 | FI | 24.09.2003 | FR | 24.09.2003 | IT | 24.09.2003 | LI | 24.09.2003 | NL | 24.09.2003 | DK | 24.12.2003 | GR | 24.12.2003 | SE | 24.12.2003 | ES | 04.01.2004 | PT | 24.02.2004 | IE | 20.05.2004 | LU | 20.05.2004 | MC | 31.05.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/22] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
CY | 24.09.2003 | ||
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
FR | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
ES | 04.01.2004 | ||
IE | 20.05.2004 | ||
LU | 20.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
FR | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
ES | 04.01.2004 | ||
IE | 20.05.2004 | ||
LU | 20.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
ES | 04.01.2004 | ||
IE | 20.05.2004 | ||
LU | 20.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
ES | 04.01.2004 | ||
LU | 20.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
ES | 04.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
ES | 04.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 24.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3504803 (BRAYMAN GEORGE E) [Y] 1-11,17-27,34-39,44-49,56-60,65-71,78-84,88-93 * Y-document with US4017400; column 2, lines 34-54; figure 1 *; | [Y]US4017400 (SCHADE HARVEY R) [Y] 1-11,17-27,34-39,44-49,56-60,65-71,78-84,88-93 * Y-Document with US4853120 or US3504803; column 5, lines 27-56; figure 4 *; | [A]US4780204 (RASMUSSEN HAROLD O [US]) [A] 99-107* the whole document *; | [Y]US4853120 (FRANTZ JOHN M) [Y] 1-11,17-27,34-39,44-49,56-60,65-71,78-84,88-93 * Y-Document with US4017400; column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 46; figures 2,3; claim 14 *; | [X]US5486290 (MCGINNESS EDWARD A [US], et al) [X] 99-107 * Y-Document with US4017400;; figures 2-5 * |