Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1040400

EP1040400 - CIRCUIT FOR REDUCING INPUT VOLTAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  11.11.2005
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.11.2005Refusal of applicationpublished on 28.12.2005  [2005/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/40]
Inventor(s)01 / KNEER, Andreas
Karlstrasse 8
D-73240 Wendlingen / DE
02 / LUTZ, Peter
Karl-Weinbrenner-Strasse 14
D-74189 Weinsberg / DE
[2000/40]
Application number, filing date99923390.124.03.1999
[2000/40]
WO1999DE00868
Priority number, dateDE199813309223.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19833092
[2000/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0005635
Date:03.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1040400
Date:04.10.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000
[2000/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:G05F1/613, H03G1/00
[2000/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/40]
TitleGerman:SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR REDUZIERUNG EINER EINGANGSSPANNUNG[2000/40]
English:CIRCUIT FOR REDUCING INPUT VOLTAGE[2000/40]
French:CIRCUIT POUR REDUIRE UNE TENSION D'ENTREE[2000/40]
Entry into regional phase25.04.2000National basic fee paid 
03.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
03.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/40]
26.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2005/52]
04.08.2005Date of oral proceedings
12.08.2005Application refused, date of legal effect [2005/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]US3636382  (CROUSE WILLIAM G) [X] 1,2,7,8 * column 7, line 35 - line 68; figure 14 *;
 [A]EP0665437  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7 * column A *;
 [DA]DE3127220  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1,7 * abstract *