blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1075253

EP1075253 - ORAL OR MUCOSAL PREPARATION CONTAINING AN ACTIVE INGREDIENT, WITH CONTROLLED ACTIVE INGREDIENT RELEASE, AND ITS USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.05.2005
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LTS LOHMANN Therapie-Systeme AG
Lohmannstrasse 2
56626 Andernach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/07]For all designated states
LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG
Lohmannstrasse 2
56626 Andernach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / VON FALKENHAUSEN, Christian
Kurfürstenplatz 17
D-53125 Bonn / DE
 [2001/07]
Representative(s)Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter
Flaccus Müller-Wolff
Patentanwälte
Bussardweg 10
50389 Wesseling / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/07]Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter, Dr.
Patentanwalt Bussardweg 10
50389 Wesseling / DE
Application number, filing date99923543.506.05.1999
[2001/07]
WO1999EP03110
Priority number, dateDE199812052908.05.1998         Original published format: DE 19820529
[2001/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9958107
Date:18.11.1999
Language:DE
[1999/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1075253
Date:14.02.2001
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1075253
Date:30.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.01.2000
ClassificationIPC:A61K9/26, A61K9/02
[2001/07]
CPC:
A61K9/2081 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/07]
Extension statesSI24.10.2000
TitleGerman:WIRKSTOFF ENTHALTENDE ORALE ODER MUCOSALE ZUBEREITUNG MIT STEUERBARER WIRKSTOFFFREISETZUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG[2001/07]
English:ORAL OR MUCOSAL PREPARATION CONTAINING AN ACTIVE INGREDIENT, WITH CONTROLLED ACTIVE INGREDIENT RELEASE, AND ITS USE[2001/07]
French:PREPARATION ORALE OU MUCOSIQUE CONTENANT UN PRINCIPE ACTIF, A LIBERATION REGULABLE DU PRINCIPE ACTIF ET SON UTILISATION[2001/07]
Entry into regional phase24.10.2000National basic fee paid 
24.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
24.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/07]
30.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.03.2004Fee for grant paid
23.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI30.06.2004
IE30.06.2004
NL30.06.2004
DK30.09.2004
GR30.09.2004
SE30.09.2004
PT30.11.2004
[2008/18]
Former [2006/47]FI30.06.2004
IE30.06.2004
NL30.06.2004
DK30.09.2004
GR30.09.2004
SE30.09.2004
Former [2005/24]FI30.06.2004
IE30.06.2004
DK30.09.2004
GR30.09.2004
SE30.09.2004
Former [2005/22]FI30.06.2004
DK30.09.2004
GR30.09.2004
SE30.09.2004
Former [2005/06]FI30.06.2004
GR30.09.2004
SE30.09.2004
Former [2005/02]FI30.06.2004
SE30.09.2004
Former [2004/52]SE30.09.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]US2996431  (HENRY BARRY RICHARD) [X] 1,2,7,10,14,16,17 * column 1, lines 37-54 * * column 3, lines 38-50 * * column 4, lines 6-9 * * claims 3,6,10 *;
 [XA]WO9428911  (FERRING A S [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,10,11,14,17,18 * page 2, lines 19-24 * * page 8, line 18 - page 9, line 27 * * example 5 * * claims 23,26 * [A] 13;
 [A]EP0636365  (MCNEIL PPC INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 54 - page 3, line 43 ** claim 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.