Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1084240

EP1084240 - POLYPEPTIDES WITH BETA-SECRETASE TYPE ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.07.2005
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.09.2005  [2005/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aventis Pharma S.A.
20, avenue Raymond Aron
92160 Antony / FR
For all designated states
Université Pierre et Marie Curie
4 Place Jussieu
75252 Paris Cedex 05 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/12]For all designated states
Aventis Pharma S.A.
20, avenue Raymond Aron
92160 Antony / FR
For all designated states
UNIVERSITE PIERRE ET MARIE CURIE
4, Place Jussieu, Tour Centrale
75252 Paris Cédex 05 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / RHOLAM, Mohamed
2, rue E. Bousseau
F-60600 Clermont / FR
02 / MUNOZ-GIMENEZ, No[li
53, rue du Chemin de Fer
F-94190 Villeneuve Saint Georges / FR
03 / MOUTAOUAKIL, Mohamed
5, allée de l'Ile Marante
F-92700 Colombes / FR
04 / COHEN, Paul
16, rue Barbette
F-75003 Paris / FR
05 / BERTRAND, Philippe
16, rue du Commandant l'Herminier
F-94240 L'Hay-les-Roses / FR
 [2001/12]
Representative(s)Nargolwalla, Cyra , et al
Cabinet Plasseraud
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR
Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/32]Nargolwalla, Cyra , et al
Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2001/12]Bouvet, Philippe
Rhône-Poulenc Rorer S.A. 20, Avenue Raymond Aron
92160 Antony / FR
Application number, filing date99923674.804.06.1999
[2001/12]
WO1999FR01326
Priority number, dateFR1998000706805.06.1998         Original published format: FR 9807068
US19990122599P31.03.1999         Original published format: US 122599 P
[2001/12]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9964587
Date:16.12.1999
Language:FR
[1999/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1084240
Date:21.03.2001
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.1999
[2001/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/12, C12N15/57, C12N9/64, C07K16/40, C12Q1/37, A61K39/395, A61K38/48, A61K31/70
[2001/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/12]
Extension statesSI11.12.2000
TitleGerman:POLYPEPTIDEN MIT BETA-SEKRETASE AKTIVITÄT[2001/12]
English:POLYPEPTIDES WITH BETA-SECRETASE TYPE ACTIVITY[2001/12]
French:POLYPEPTIDES POSSEDANT UNE ACTIVITE DE TYPE BETA-SECRETASE[2001/12]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2000National basic fee paid 
11.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/12]
20.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/36]
11.04.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9640885  (ATHENA NEUROSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-10,13-29 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9203542  (UNIV BOSTON [US]) [X] 1,2,13 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9207068  (ATHENA NEUROSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-10,13-29 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0576152  (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [X] 1-3,7-9,13-16,24-29 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9113904  (CEPHALON INC [US]) [X] 1-3,13 * page 35 - page 63 *;
 [X]EP0569777  (MILES INC [US]) [X] 1-3,7-10,13-29 * example 10; claim - *;
 [X]  - NELSON R B ET AL, "CLIPSIN, A CHYMOTRYPSIN-LIKE PROTEASE IN RAT BRAIN WHICH IS IRREVERSIBLY INHIBITED BY ALPHA-1-ANTICHYMOTRYPSIN", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19900305), vol. 265, no. 7, pages 3836 - 3843, XP002011909 [X] 1,2,13 * the whole document *
 [A]  - EVIN G ET AL, "ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE AMYLOID PRECURSOR PROTEIN (ABETAPP): PROTEOLYTIC PROCESSING, SECRETASES AND BETAA4 AMYLOID PRODUCTION", AMYLOID, (1994), vol. 1, no. 4, pages 263 - 280, XP000602976
 [X]  - BROWN A M ET AL, "EVALUATION OF CATHEPSINS D AND G AND EC 3.4.24.15 AS CANDIDATE BETA-SECRETASE PROTEASES USING PEPTIDE AND AMYLOID PRECURSOR PROTEIN SUBSTATES", JOURNAL OF NEUROCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 66, no. 6, pages 2436 - 2445, XP000602767 [X] 1-3 * the whole document *