Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1001082

EP1001082 - USE OF AN ESTER COMPOUND AS A PAPER BULKING PROMOTER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A BULKY PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/20]PAPER BULKING AGENTS
[2002/40]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.07.2004
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.08.2004  [2004/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KAO CORPORATION
14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0025 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
Kao Corporation
14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0025 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TADOKORO, Takaaki, Kao Corporation, Research Lab.
1334, Minato, Wakayama-shi
Wakayama 640-8580 / JP
02 / IKEDA, Yasushi, Kao Corporation, Research Lab.
1334, Minato, Wakayama-shi
Wakayama 640-8580 / JP
03 / IKENAGA, Takayuki, Kao Corporation, Research Lab.
1334, Minato, Wakayama-shi
Wakayama 640-8580 / JP
04 / MORI, Atsuhito, Kao Corporation, Research Lab.
1334, Minato, Wakayama-shi
Wakayama 640-8580 / JP
05 / ISHIBASHI, Yoichi, Kao Corporation, Research Lab.
1334, Minato, Wakayama-shi
Wakayama 640-8580 / JP
06 / ISHII, Yasuo, Kao Corporation, Research Lab.
1334, Minato, Wakayama-shi
Wakayama 640-8580 / JP
07 / NISHIMORI, Toshiyuki, Kao Corporation, Res.Lab.
1334, Minato, Wakayama-shi
Wakayama 640-8580 / JP
08 / TAKAHASHI, Hiromichi, Kao Corporation, Res. Lab.
1334, Minato, Wakayama-shi
Wakayama 640-8580 / JP
[2000/20]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99923869.402.06.1999
[2000/20]
WO1999JP02947
Priority number, dateJP1998015281402.06.1998         Original published format: JP 15281498
[2000/20]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9963156
Date:09.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1001082
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999
[2000/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1001082
Date:27.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP09.12.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:D21H17/14, D21H21/24
[2000/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2000/20]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG EINER ESTERVERBINDUNG ALS MITTEL ZUR ERHÖHUNG DES VOLUMENS EINES PAPIERS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES VOLUMINÖSEN PAPIERS[2002/40]
English:USE OF AN ESTER COMPOUND AS A PAPER BULKING PROMOTER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A BULKY PAPER[2002/40]
French:USAGE D'UN COMPOSE ESTER COMME PROMOTEUR BOUFFANT POUR PAPIER ET METHODE POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UN PAPIER BOUFFANT[2002/40]
Former [2000/20]BLASIGE HILFSMITTEL FÜR PAPIER
Former [2000/20]PAPER BULKING AGENTS
Former [2000/20]AGENTS GONFLANTS POUR PAPIER
Entry into regional phase02.02.2000Translation filed 
02.02.2000National basic fee paid 
02.02.2000Search fee paid 
02.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
19.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
11.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.06.2003Fee for grant paid
11.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02013496.1  / EP1247898
Opposition(s)28.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]DE4202703  (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5716692  (WARNER ALRICK VINCENT [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,10 * column 3 - column 10 *;
 [XA]GB2268941  (ROE LEE PAPER CHEMICALS COMPAN [GB]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [A] 6-8,10
International search[X]JPS57101096  (KAO CORP)
ExaminationWO9803730
 WO9405856