Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037174

EP1037174 - DEVICE FOR COUNTING COINS OR THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.07.2007
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sugai General Industries Ltd.
1-99, Miyawaki-cho, Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi
Aichi-ken 454-0842 / JP
For all designated states
Wing Design Co., Prev.
5-1 Hanakagecho, 2-chome Himeji-shi
Hyougo-ken 670-0047 / JP
[2006/35]
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
Sugai general industries Ltd.
1-99, Miyawaki-cho, Nakagawa-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 454-0842 / JP
For all designated states
Wing Design Co., Prev.
5-1 Hanakagecho, 2-chome
Himeji-shi, Hyougo-ken 670-0047 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sugai, Katsumi, Sugai General Industries Ltd.
1-99 Miyawaki-cho, Nakagawa-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 454-0842 / JP
02 / Nakatani, Nobuyuki, Wing Design Co.
Prev., 5-1 Hanakagecho 2-chome
Himeji-shi, Hyougo-ken 670-0047 / JP
03 / Nakamura, Masanari, Paltec Co., Ltd.
319-1 Oota, Seba
Shiojiri-shi, Nagano-ken 399-6462 / JP
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Frühlingstrasse 43A
45133 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/20]GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43A
45133 Essen / DE
Former [2000/38]Schumacher, Horst, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. , et al
König-Palgen-Schumacher-Kluin Patentanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43A
45133 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date99924012.010.06.1999
[2000/38]
WO1999JP03139
Priority number, dateJP1998016705715.06.1998         Original published format: JP 16705798
[2000/38]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9966457
Date:23.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1037174
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1999
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1037174
Date:30.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP23.12.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2004
ClassificationInternational:G07D9/00
[2004/38]
Former International [2000/38]G07D9/04
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE [2000/48]
Former [2000/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZÄHLEN VON MÜNZEN ODER DERGLEICHEN[2000/38]
English:DEVICE FOR COUNTING COINS OR THE LIKE[2000/38]
French:DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE COMPTER DES PIECES DE MONNAIE OU ANALOGUE[2000/38]
Entry into regional phase10.02.2000Translation filed 
07.03.2000National basic fee paid 
07.03.2000Search fee paid 
07.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
16.03.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
03.07.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
05.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2006Fee for grant paid
10.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
01.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
16.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
16.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
16.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.04.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0526049  (ASAHI SEIKO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * column 4, lines 20-52 * * column 6, line 39 - column 7, line 15 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5114381  (UEDA NOBUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 4, lines 4-17 * * column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 57 * * column 7, lines 25-42 * * figures 1,4 *;
 [A]GB2080518  (LAUREL BANK MACHINE CO) [A] 1,7 * page 1, line 92 - page 2, line 33 * * figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US4441516  (STADLER WERNER [DE], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 18 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US3910295  (FLETCHER PATRICK A) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 48 * * column 3, lines 3-7 * * figures 1,2 *
International search[A]JP2523391B  ;
 [A]JPH0295470U
by applicantJPH09500468
 WO9504978