Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1078525

EP1078525 - INTERACTIVE TELEVISION PROGRAM GUIDE SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING USER VALUES FOR DEMOGRAPHIC CATEGORIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 06.06.2007  [2007/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United Video Properties, Inc.
7140 South Lewis Avenue
Tulsa, OK 74136 / US
[2001/09]
Inventor(s)01 / KNEE, Robert, A.
747 Grissom Drive
Lansdale, PA 19446 / US
02 / REYNOLDS, Steven, J.
812 Altair Drive
Littleton, CO 80124 / US
03 / ELLIS, Michael, D.
1300 Kingwood Place
Boulder, CO 80304 / US
04 / HASSELL, Joel, G.
8246 Yarrow Court
Arvada, CO 80005 / US
 [2001/09]
Representative(s)Hale, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/35]Hale, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2001/09]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date99924223.313.05.1999
[2001/09]
WO1999US10586
Priority number, dateUS19980085750P15.05.1998         Original published format: US 85750 P
US1998013977725.08.1998         Original published format: US 139777
[2001/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9960789
Date:25.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1078525
Date:28.02.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999
[2001/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1078525
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/16, H04N7/173
[2001/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/09]
TitleGerman:INTERAKTIVES FERNSEHPROGRAMMFÜHRUNGSSYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON BENUTZERWERTEN FÜR DEMOGRAPHISCHE KATEGORIEN[2001/09]
English:INTERACTIVE TELEVISION PROGRAM GUIDE SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING USER VALUES FOR DEMOGRAPHIC CATEGORIES[2001/09]
French:GUIDE INTERACTIF DE PROGRAMMES DE TELEVISION PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER DES VALEURS D'ENTREE UTILISATEUR POUR DES CATEGORIES DEMOGRAPHIQUES[2001/09]
Entry into regional phase01.12.2000National basic fee paid 
01.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/09]
27.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2002Fee for grant paid
12.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02011429.4  / EP1237372
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
DK18.12.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
CY13.05.2003
IE13.05.2003
LU13.05.2003
MC31.05.2003
[2007/23]
Former [2005/02]AT18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
CY13.05.2003
IE13.05.2003
LU13.05.2003
MC31.05.2003
Former [2004/39]AT18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
CY13.05.2003
IE13.05.2003
LU13.05.2003
Former [2004/36]AT18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
CY13.05.2003
IE13.05.2003
Former [2004/29]AT18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
IE13.05.2003
Former [2003/31]AT18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
Former [2003/29]FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
Former [2003/20]FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
Former [2003/14]FI18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
Cited inInternational search[YA]US5559549  (HENDRICKS JOHN S [US], et al) [Y] 1,5,12-15 * the whole document * [A] 2-4,6-11,16,17;
 [YA]WO9608109  (CARLES JOHN B [US]) [Y] 1,5,12-15 * the whole document * [A] 2-4,6-11,16,17;
 [A]WO9608113  (BYLON CO LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0424648  (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0784405  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *