Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1077731

EP1077731 - INTRAMOLECULARLY-QUENCHED NEAR INFRARED FLUORESCENT PROBES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.05.2011
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 31.08.2011  [2011/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION
55 Fruit Street
Boston, MA 02114 / US
[2010/27]
Former [2001/09]For all designated states
THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION
55 Fruit Street
Boston, MA 02114 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Weissleder, Ralph
Apartment 731, 197 8th Street
Charlestown, MA 02129 / US
02 / Tung, Ching-Hsuan
Apartment 19, 5 Post Oak Lane
Natick, MA 01760 / US
03 / Mahmood, Umar
10 Emerson Place 24K
Boston, MA 02114 / US
04 / JOSEPHSON, Lee
14 Churchill Avenue
Arlington, MA 02174 / US
05 / BOGDANOV, Alexei
10 Hathaway Circle
Arlington, MA 02174 / US
 [2007/32]
Former [2001/19]01 / Weissleder, Ralph
Apartment 731, 197 8th Street
Charlestown, MA 02129 / US
02 / Tung, Ching-Hsuan
Apartment 19, 5 Post Oak Lane
Natick, MA 01760 / US
03 / Mahmood, Umar
10 Emerson Place # 24K
Boston, MA 02114 / US
04 / JOSEPHSON, Lee
14 Churchill Avenue
Arlington, MA 02174 / US
05 / BOGDANOV, Alexei
10 Hathaway Circle
Arlington, MA 02174 / US
Former [2001/09]01 / Weissleder, Ralph
Apartment 731, 197 8th Street
Charlestown, MA 02129 / US
02 / Tung, Ching-Hsuan
Apartment 19, 5 Post Oak Lane
Natick, MA 01760 / US
03 / Mahmood, Umar
Apartment 25, 370 Longwood Avenue
Boston, MA 02115 / US
04 / JOSEPHSON, Lee
14 Churchill Avenue
Arlington, MA 02174 / US
05 / BOGDANOV, Alexei
10 Hathaway Circle
Arlington, MA 02174 / US
Representative(s)Peterreins, Frank
Fish & Richardson P.C.
Highlight Business Towers
Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8
80807 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/02]Peterreins, Frank
Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8
80807 München / DE
Former [2006/42]Wallace, Sheila Jane , et al
Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Former [2001/09]White, Martin Paul , et al
Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street
GB-London WC1A 1LW / GB
Application number, filing date99924225.813.05.1999
[2001/09]
WO1999US10589
Priority number, dateUS1998007944714.05.1998         Original published format: US 79447
[2001/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9958161
Date:18.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1077731
Date:28.02.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999
[2001/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1077731
Date:07.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/27]
Search report(s)International search reportUS18.11.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP25.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61K49/00
[2009/49]
Former International [2001/09]A61K49/00, G01N31/00, G01N33/48
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/09]
TitleGerman:IM NAHEN INFRAROTBEREICH FLUORESZIERENDE SONDEN DIE INTRAMOLEKULAR QUENCHIERT WERDEN[2009/49]
English:INTRAMOLECULARLY-QUENCHED NEAR INFRARED FLUORESCENT PROBES[2001/09]
French:SONDES FLUORESCENTES EN PROCHE INFRAROUGE QUENCHÉES INTRAMOLECULAIREMENT[2009/49]
Former [2001/09]IM NAHEN INFRAROTBEREICH FLUORESZIERENDE SONDEN DIE INTRAMOLEKULAR ABGEREGT WERDEN
Former [2001/09]SONDES FLUORESCENTES EN PROCHE INFRAROUGE A EXTENSION INTRAMOLECULAIRE
Entry into regional phase12.12.2000National basic fee paid 
12.12.2000Search fee paid 
12.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
12.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/09]
26.05.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.10.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
11.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2009Date of oral proceedings
18.11.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
01.12.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.03.2010Fee for grant paid
04.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP09013042.8   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 27.01.2010
EP10168642.6  / EP2251041
Opposition(s)08.04.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/24]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
10.01.2008Request for further processing filed
10.01.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.02.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
30.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
30.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
28.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.07.2010
BE07.07.2010
CY07.07.2010
DK07.07.2010
FI07.07.2010
IT07.07.2010
SE07.07.2010
GR08.10.2010
ES18.10.2010
PT08.11.2010
[2011/35]
Former [2011/26]AT07.07.2010
BE07.07.2010
CY07.07.2010
DK07.07.2010
FI07.07.2010
IT07.07.2010
SE07.07.2010
GR08.10.2010
PT08.11.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]  FLANAGAN, JAMES H., JR. ET AL, "Functionalized tricarbocyanine dyes as near-infrared fluorescent probes for biomolecules.", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, VOL. 8, NO. 5, PP. 751-756. CODEN: BCCHES. ISSN: 1043-1802., (1997), XP002272364 [X] 1 * abstract *
 [PX]  WEISSLEDER, RALPH ET AL, "In vivo imaging of tumors with protease-activated near-infrared fluorescent probes", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY , 17(4), 375-378 CODEN: NABIF9; ISSN: 1087-0156, (1999), XP002272365 [PX] 1-19 * figures 1,2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/7933
International search[YP]US5846703  (DEVLIN ROBERT F [US], et al);
 [Y]  - BALLOU B., ET AL., "TUMOR LABELING IN VIVO USING CYANINE-CONJUGATED MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES.", CANCER IMMUNOLOGY AND IMMUNOTHERAPY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, BERLIN, DE, (19950101), vol. 41., doi:10.1007/BF01517001, ISSN 0340-7004, pages 257 - 263., XP002919350

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01517001
 [Y]  - GULNIK S V, ET AL., "DESIGN OF SENSITIVE FLUOROGENIC SUBSTRATES FOR HUMAN CATHEPSIN D", FEBS LETTERS., ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM., NL, NL, (19970101), vol. 413, doi:10.1016/S0014-5793(97)00886-7, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 379 - 384, XP002919351

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(97)00886-7
ExaminationWO9840106
 WO8804777