Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1077721

EP1077721 - PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF HYPERGASTRINEMIA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.03.2008
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Receptor Biologix, Inc.
3350 West Bayshore Road, Suite 150
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
[N/P]
Former [2007/21]For all designated states
Receptor Biologix, Inc.
3350 W. Bayshore Road, Suite 150
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
Former [2007/18]For all designated states
Receptor Biologix, Inc.
1140 Veterans Boulevard, Suite A
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
Former [2001/09]For all designated states
APHTON CORP.
Brickell Bay View Center, Suite 2160, 80 S.W. 8th Street
Miami, FL 33130 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GEVAS, Philip, C.
881 Ocean Drive 23D
Key Biscayne, FL 33149 / US
02 / GRIMES, Stephen
551 Rutgers Drive
Davis, CA 95616 / US
03 / KARR, Stephen
2265 Halsey Circle
Davis, CA 95616 / US
04 / MICHAELI, Dov
21 Marina Vista Avenue
Larkspur, CA 94939 / US
05 / WATSON, Susan
5 Seatolla Close
Edwalton, Nottingham NG2 6RB / GB
 [2001/09]
Representative(s)Manaton, Ross Timothy , et al
Bromhead Johnson
57-59 High Street
Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/24]Manaton, Ross Timothy , et al
Bromhead Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn
London WC1V 7DP / GB
Former [2004/23]Hale, Stephen Geoffrey , et al
Bromhead Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn
London WC1V 7DP / GB
Former [2001/09]Hale, Stephen Geoffrey , et al
JY & GW Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn
London WC1V 7DP / GB
Application number, filing date99924258.914.05.1999
[2001/09]
WO1999US10751
Priority number, dateUS19980085714P15.05.1998         Original published format: US 85714 P
[2001/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9959631
Date:25.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1077721
Date:28.02.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999
[2001/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1077721
Date:02.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/18]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1077721
Date:20.06.2007
[2007/25]
Search report(s)International search reportUS25.11.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP15.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/385, C07K7/06, C07K7/08
[2001/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/09]
TitleGerman:VORBEUGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON HYPERGASTRINEMIE[2006/41]
English:PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF HYPERGASTRINEMIA[2001/09]
French:PREVENTION ET TRAITEMENT DE L'HYPERGASTRINEMIE[2001/09]
Former [2001/09]VOBEUGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON HYPERGASTRINEMIE
Entry into regional phase11.12.2000National basic fee paid 
11.12.2000Search fee paid 
11.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
27.11.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/09]
14.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.02.2007Fee for grant paid
28.02.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP07008760.6  / EP1839673
EP07008761.4  / EP1897556
Opposition(s)05.02.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
10.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200507   M06   Fee paid on   10.10.2005
31.05.200608   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9728821  (APHTON CORP [US]) [X] 1-8,9-29 * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 2 * * page 4, line 9 - line 28 * * page 5, line 7 - line 33 * * page 7, line 16 - line 24 * * claims 1,2 * * figure 1 * * the whole document *;
 [X]  - WATSON SUSAN A ET AL, "Pre-clinical evaluation of the gastrimmune immunogen alone and in combination with 5-fluorouracil/leucovorin in a rat colorectal cancer model.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, (19980316), vol. 75, no. 6, ISSN 0020-7136, pages 873 - 877, XP002194963 [X] 1-8,9-29 * page 873, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 873, column R, paragraph 4 * * page 874, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 874, column L, paragraph 8 - column R, paragraph 1 * * page 877, column R, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0215(19980316)75:6<873::AID-IJC9>3.0.CO;2-S
 [Y]  - SUMII MASAHARU ET AL, "Regulation of antral peptides by administration of omeprazole to healthy men.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1994), vol. 89, no. 11, ISSN 0002-9270, pages 2033 - 2037, XP001068668 [Y] 11,13-25,27-29 * abstract * * page 2033, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 2034, column R, paragraph 7 * * page 2035, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 2036, column L *
 [Y]  - MCCLOY R F ET AL, "Pathophysiological effects of long-term acid suppression in man.", DIGESTIVE DISEASES AND SCIENCES, (1995), vol. 40, no. 2 SUPPL., ISSN 0163-2116, pages 96S - 120S, XP001068385 [Y] 11-29 * abstract * * page 104S, column L, paragraph 4 * * page 103S, column L, paragraph 4 - column R, paragraph 1 * * page 102S, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 100S, column L, paragraph 5 - column R, paragraph 1 *
 [Y]  - FRESTON JAMES W, "Long-term acid control and proton pump inhibitors: Interactions and safety issues in perspective.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1997), vol. 92, no. 4 SUPPL., ISSN 0002-9270, pages 51S - 57S, XP001068667 [Y] 11-29 * abstract * * page 52S, column R, paragraphs 2,4,5 * * page 51S, column R, paragraphs 1,3,4 * * page 51S, column L, paragraph 2 *
International search[X]US5023077  (GEVAS PHILIP C [US], et al);
 [X]US5468494  (GEVAS PHILIP C [US], et al);
 [X]US5609870  (GEVAS PHILIP C [US], et al);
 [X]US5607676  (GEVAS PHILIP C [US], et al);
 [X]US5622702  (GEVAS PHILIP C [US], et al)
 [A]  - THORNDYKE M., "Identification and localization of material with gastrin-like immunoreactivity in the neutral ganglion of a photochordate, Ciona intestinalis", REGULATORY PEPTIDES, (1986), vol. 16, pages 269 - 279,
 [X]  - WATSON ET AL, "Gastriimmune Raises Antibodies that Neutralize Amidated and Glycine extended Gastrin-17 and inhibit the growth of colon cancer", CANCER RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 56, pages 880 - 885,
 [X]  - WATSON ET AL, "Anti-gastrin antibodies raised by gastriimmune inhibit growth of the human colorectal tumor AP5", INT. J. CANCER, (1995), vol. 61, pages 233 - 240,