Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1090090

EP1090090 - METHODS FOR MAKING A PITCH-BASED CARBON FOAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.06.2004
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.07.2004  [2004/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AlliedSignal Inc.
101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245
Morristown NJ 07962-2245 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
AlliedSignal Inc.
101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245
Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MURDIE, Neil
Apartment D, 1621 N. Riverside Drive
South Bend, IN 46616 / US
02 / PIGFORD, James
1005 Royal Vineyard
South Bend, IN 46637 / US
03 / WOOD, Mike
1921 Cross Creek Drive
South Bend, IN 46628 / US
04 / DILLON, Frank
51732 James Lawrence Parkway
Granger, IN 46530 / US
05 / PARKER, Charles
52199 Arrowhead Circle
Granger, IN 46530 / US
06 / HEMSTAD, Stan
50634 Stonington Drive
Granger, IN 46530 / US
 [2001/15]
Representative(s)Hucker, Charlotte Jane , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London
EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/48]Hucker, Charlotte Jane , et al
Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2001/15]Sturm, Christoph
Honeywell AG, Kaiserleistrasse 39
63067 Offenbach am Main / DE
Application number, filing date99924425.421.05.1999
[2001/15]
WO1999US11279
Priority number, dateUS19980086371P22.05.1998         Original published format: US 86371 P
US1998011299410.07.1998         Original published format: US 112994
[2001/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9961549
Date:02.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1090090
Date:11.04.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999
[2001/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1090090
Date:06.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/32]
Search report(s)International search reportEP02.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C10C3/00, C04B35/52, C04B38/00
[2001/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AUF TEER BASIERTEM KOHLENSTOFFSCHAUM[2001/15]
English:METHODS FOR MAKING A PITCH-BASED CARBON FOAM[2001/15]
French:PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION D'UNE MOUSSE DE CARBONE A BASE DE BRAI[2001/15]
Entry into regional phase01.12.2000National basic fee paid 
01.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/15]
26.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.05.2003Fee for grant paid
30.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
06.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
07.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9324590  (CONOCO INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 5 * * page 5, line 22 - line 32 * * page 6, line 25 - page 7, line 19 * * page 8, line 16 - line 19; example 1; claims 1,3,5,17 *;
 [Y]JPH02142891
 [Y]  - 1, vol. 90, no. 28, Database accession no. 90-213280, XP002900628 [Y] 1-15 * abstract *