Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1080197

EP1080197 - CELL CYCLE GENES, PROTEINS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.08.2004
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2008Change - applicantpublished on 06.08.2008  [2008/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL, INC.
800 Capital Square, 400 Locust Street
Des Moines, Iowa 50309 / US
For all designated states
The Arizona Board of Regents on behalf of the University of Arizona
P.O. Box 210151
Tucson AZ 85721-0151 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/32]For all designated states
PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL, INC.
800 Capital Square, 400 Locust Street
Des Moines, Iowa 50309 / US
For all designated states
The Arizona Board of Regents on behalf of the University of Arizona
P.O. Box 210151
Tucson AZ 85721-0151 / US
Former [2001/10]For all designated states
PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL, INC.
800 Capital Square, 400 Locust Street
Des Moines, Iowa 50309 / US
For all designated states
The Arizona Board of Regents on Behalf of the University of Arizona
Office of Technology Transfer, Babcock Building, Room 3205, 1717 E. Speedway Boulevard
Tucson, Az 85721-0151 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LOWE, Keith, S.
6407 Harbor Oaks Drive
Johnston, IA 50131 / US
02 / GORDON-KAMM, William, J.
3916 67th Street
Urbandale, IA 50322 / US
03 / BAILEY, Matthew, A.
4032 42nd Street
Des Moines, IA 50310 / US
04 / WANG, Xun
12524 Caminito Vista Soledad
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
05 / GREGORY, Carolyn, A.
1411 N.W. 137th Court
Clive, IA 50325 / US
06 / McELVER, John, A.
2800 64th Street
Des Moines, IA 50322 / US
07 / HOERSTER, George, J.
2623 Payne Road
Des Moines, IA 50310 / US
08 / ABBITT, Shane
919 S.E. Delaware Avenue
Ankeny, IA 50021 / US
09 / DILKES, Brian, R.
129 N.Martin Avenue
Tucson, AZ 85719 / US
10 / LARKINS, Brian, A.
2701 North Shannon
Tucson, AZ 85745 / US
11 / BOWEN, Benjamin, A.
3008 36th Street
Des Moines, IA 50310 / US
 [2001/28]
Former [2001/10]01 / LOWE, Keith, S.
6407 Harbor Oaks Drive
Johnston, IA 50131 / US
02 / GORDON-KAMM, William, J.
3916 67th Street
Urbandale, IA 50322 / US
03 / BAILEY, Matthew, A.
4032 42nd Street
Des Moines, IA 50310 / US
04 / WANG, Xun
12524 Caminito Vista Soledad
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
05 / GREGORY, Carolyn, A.
1411 N.W. 137th Court
Clive, IA 50325 / US
06 / McELVER, John, A.
2800 64th Street
Des Moines, IA 50322 / US
07 / HOERSTER, George, J.
2623 Payne Road
Des Moines, IA 50310 / US
08 / ABBITT, Shane
919 S.E. Delaware Avenue
Ankeny, IA 50021 / US
09 / DILKES, Brian, R.
617 South 6th Avenue
Tucson, AZ 85701 / US
10 / LARKINS, Brian, A.
2701 North Shannon
Tucson, AZ 85745 / US
11 / BOWEN, Benjamin, A.
3008 36th Street
Des Moines, IA 50310 / US
Representative(s)Bentham, Andrew , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/08]Bentham, Andrew , et al
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2001/10]Goldin, Douglas Michael , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date99924470.020.05.1999
[2001/10]
WO1999US11411
Priority number, dateUS19980086381P22.05.1998         Original published format: US 86381 P
[2001/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9961619
Date:02.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1080197
Date:07.03.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999
[2001/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/29, C12N15/62, C12N15/82, C12N1/21, C07K14/415, A01H5/00, C12Q1/68
[2001/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/10]
TitleGerman:ZELLZYKLUS GENE UND PROTEINE, UND IHRE ANWENDUNG[2001/10]
English:CELL CYCLE GENES, PROTEINS AND USES THEREOF[2001/10]
French:GENES ET PROTEINES DE CYCLE CELLULAIRE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2001/10]
Entry into regional phase07.12.2000National basic fee paid 
07.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/10]
26.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/39]
15.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9505471  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [A] 34-42 * the whole document *;
 [PX]WO9841642  (VLAAMS INTERUNIV INST BIOTECH [BE], et al) [PX] 1-33 * the whole document * * page 41 - page 42 *
 [X]  - DE VEYLDER L ET AL., "CKS1 GENE", EMBL DATABASE ACCESSION NUMBER AJ000016, (19970722), XP002114545 [X] 1,3,5-11,20-29 * the whole document *
 [XY]  - VEYLDER DE L ET AL, "THE ARABIDOPSIS CKS1AT PROTEIN BINDS THE CYCLIN-DEPENDENT KINASES CDC2AAT AND CDC2BAT", FEBS LETTERS, (19970804), vol. 412, no. 3, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 446 - 452, XP002047992 [X] 1,3,5-11,20-29 * the whole document * [Y] 1-33

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(97)00822-3
 [X]  - HERRERA-ESTRELLA A, ET AL., "A bacterial peptide acting as a plant nuclear targeting signal: The amino-terminal portion of Agrobacterium VirD2 protein directs a .beta.-galactosidase fusion protein into tobacco nuclei", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, (199012), vol. 87, pages 9534 - 9537, XP002132566 [X] 34-36,38-40 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.87.24.9534
 [Y]  - JOHN PCL ET AL., "ASSOCIATION OF THE PLANT p34cdc2-LIKE PROTEIN WITH p13suc1: IMPLICATIONS FOR CONTROL OF CELL DIVISION CYCLES IN PLANTS", PROTOPLASMA, (1991), vol. 161, no. 1, pages 70 - 74, XP002114476 [Y] 1-33 * abstract * * page 74 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01328899
 [A]  - DOONAN J, FOBERT P, "CONSERVED AND NOVEL REGULATORS OF THE PLANT CELL CYCLE", CURRENT OPINION IN CELL BIOLOGY, (199712), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 824 - 830, XP002114477 [A] 1-33 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0955-0674(97)80083-X
 [A]  - PINES J, "CELL CYCLE: REACHING FOR A ROLE FOR THE CKS PROTEINS", CURRENT BIOLOGY, (19961101), vol. 6, no. 11, ISSN 0960-9822, pages 1399 - 1402, XP002910838 [A] 30-33 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(96)00741-5
 [A]  - CITOVSKY V ET AL, "NUCLEAR IMPORT OF AGROBACTERIUM VIRD2 AND VIRE2 PROTEINS IN MAIZE AND TOBACCO", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA,US,NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, (19940412), vol. 91, no. 8, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 3210 - 3214, XP002024241 [A] 34-42 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.8.3210
 [A]  - CITOVSKY V ET AL, "NUCLEAR LOCATIZATION OF AGROBACTERIUM VIRE2 PROTEIN IN PLANT CELLS", SCIENCE,US,AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, (19920626), vol. 256, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1802 - 1805, XP002024324 [A] 34-42 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1615325