Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1101049

EP1101049 - GEAR HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.08.2008
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.07.2011  [2011/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Precision Products Systems, LLC
201 Waubesa Street
Madison, WI 53704 / US
[2001/21]
Inventor(s)01 / EVANS, Dale, M.
6674 Chestnut Circle
Windsor, WI 53598 / US
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Englaender, Klaus , et al
HML Patentanwälte Schraudolphstrasse 3
80799 München / DE
[2007/30]
Former [2007/27]Jung Schirdewahn Grünberg Schneider
Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 4
80538 München / DE
Former [2005/14]Grünberg, Thomas Dr. , et al
JUNG HML Schraudolphstrasse 3
80799 München / DE
Former [2001/21]Lippert, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Holtz Martin Lippert Emil-Claar-Strasse 20
60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Application number, filing date99924487.425.05.1999
[2001/21]
WO1999US11479
Priority number, dateUS1998009573611.06.1998         Original published format: US 95736
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9964766
Date:16.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1101049
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.1999
[2001/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1101049
Date:24.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:F16H1/16, F16H57/02, E05F15/16
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/21]
Extension statesAL14.03.2001
LT14.03.2001
LV14.03.2001
MK14.03.2001
RO14.03.2001
SI14.03.2001
TitleGerman:GETRIEBEGEHÄUSE[2001/21]
English:GEAR HOUSING[2001/21]
French:BOITE DE VITESSES[2001/21]
Entry into regional phase14.03.2001National basic fee paid 
14.03.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
14.03.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.03.2001Examination requested  [2006/27]
21.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2006Fee for grant paid
19.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.07.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
04.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
30.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
31.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
18.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.02.2001AT   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2001
16.02.2001BE   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2001
16.02.2001CH   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2001
16.02.2001CY   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2001
16.02.2001DE   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2001
16.02.2001DK   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2001
16.02.2001ES   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2001
16.02.2001FI   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2001
16.02.2001FR   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2001
16.02.2001GB   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2001
16.02.2001GR   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2001
16.02.2001IE   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2001
16.02.2001IT   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2001
16.02.2001LU   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2001
16.02.2001MC   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2001
16.02.2001NL   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2001
16.02.2001PT   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2001
16.02.2001SE   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2001
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
16.02.2001M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE24.10.2007
CH24.10.2007
CY24.10.2007
DK24.10.2007
FI24.10.2007
LI24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
SE24.01.2008
GR25.01.2008
ES04.02.2008
PT24.03.2008
AT25.05.2008
GB25.05.2008
LU25.05.2008
IE26.05.2008
IT31.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
FR02.06.2008
[2011/28]
Former [2010/28]BE24.10.2007
CH24.10.2007
CY24.10.2007
DK24.10.2007
FI24.10.2007
LI24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
SE24.01.2008
GR25.01.2008
ES04.02.2008
PT24.03.2008
AT25.05.2008
GB25.05.2008
LU25.05.2008
IE26.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
FR02.06.2008
Former [2010/06]BE24.10.2007
CH24.10.2007
CY24.10.2007
DK24.10.2007
FI24.10.2007
LI24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
SE24.01.2008
GR25.01.2008
ES04.02.2008
PT24.03.2008
AT25.05.2008
GB25.05.2008
IE26.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
FR02.06.2008
Former [2009/30]BE24.10.2007
CH24.10.2007
DK24.10.2007
FI24.10.2007
LI24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
SE24.01.2008
GR25.01.2008
ES04.02.2008
PT24.03.2008
GB25.05.2008
IE26.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
FR02.06.2008
Former [2009/13]BE24.10.2007
CH24.10.2007
DK24.10.2007
FI24.10.2007
LI24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
SE24.01.2008
GR25.01.2008
ES04.02.2008
PT24.03.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2009/04]BE24.10.2007
CH24.10.2007
DK24.10.2007
LI24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
SE24.01.2008
ES04.02.2008
PT24.03.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2008/40]BE24.10.2007
CH24.10.2007
DK24.10.2007
LI24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
SE24.01.2008
ES04.02.2008
PT24.03.2008
Former [2008/35]CH24.10.2007
DK24.10.2007
LI24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
SE24.01.2008
ES04.02.2008
PT24.03.2008
Former [2008/24]CH24.10.2007
LI24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
SE24.01.2008
ES04.02.2008
PT24.03.2008
Former [2008/23]CH24.10.2007
LI24.10.2007
NL24.10.2007
SE24.01.2008
ES04.02.2008
Cited inInternational search[A]US3321989  (LOWLEY EDWARD S) [A] 1,10,14 * column 3, lines 19-21; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5287770  (MUDD GEORGE W [US]) [A] 1,10,14 * column 7, lines 6-15 *;
 [A]FR2537071  (RAU SWF AUTOZUBEHOER [DE]) [A] 1,10,14 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0655358  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,10,14 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 8; figure 1 *