Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1076785

EP1076785 - INFINITELY VARIABLE TOROIDAL DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.08.2002
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.10.2002  [2002/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZF Friedrichshafen AG
Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1
88046 Friedrichshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/08]For all designated states
ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft
88038 Friedrichshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KUHN, Walter
Säntisstrasse 19
D-88045 Friedrichshafen / DE
02 / WAFZIG, Jürgen
Graf-Ernst-Weg 7
D-88097 Eriskirch / DE
03 / HOHER, Markus
Linzgaustrasse 52
D-88048 Friedrichshafen / DE
 [2001/08]
Application number, filing date99924863.603.05.1999
[2001/08]
WO1999EP02983
Priority number, dateDE199812007106.05.1998         Original published format: DE 19820071
[2001/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9957460
Date:11.11.1999
Language:DE
[1999/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1076785
Date:21.02.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1999
[2001/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:F16H15/38
[2001/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/10]
Former [2001/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:STUFENLOSES REIBRADGETRIEBE[2001/08]
English:INFINITELY VARIABLE TOROIDAL DRIVE[2001/08]
French:BOITE TOROIDALE A REGLAGE CONTINU[2001/08]
Entry into regional phase19.08.2000National basic fee paid 
19.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
19.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.08.2000Examination requested  [2001/08]
11.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.03.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/40]
26.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[E]DE19754725  (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [E] 1-4 * figure 1 *;
 [PX]WO9905434  (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE], et al) [PX] 1 * page 8, line 4 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US3087348  (KRAUS CHARLES E) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 64 - line 66 * * column 6, line 36 - line 69 * * column 8, line 16 - line 35 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4968289  (NAKANO MASAKI [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]FR964322  (BREVETS AÉRO-MÉCANIQUES S.A.) [A] 1 * page 2, line 37 - line 44 * * figure 1 *;
 [PA]JPH1151137
 [PA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 099, no. 005, [PA] 1 * abstract *