Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1078235

EP1078235 - DEVICE FOR MONITORING TEMPERATURE DISTRIBUTIONS ON THE BASIS OF DISTRIBUTED FIBER-OPTIC SENSING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/09]METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MONITORING TEMPERATURE DISTRIBUTIONS ON THE BASIS OF DISTRIBUTED FIBER-OPTIC SENSING, AND USE OF SAME
[2004/39]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.02.2006
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GESO Gesellschaft für Sensorik, Geotechnischen Umweltschutz und Mathematische Modellierung mbH, Jena
Löbstedter Strasse 47b
07749 Jena / DE
[2005/13]
Former [2001/09]For all designated states
GESO Gesellschaft für Sensorik, Geotechnischen Umweltschutz und Mathematiche Modellierung mbH Jena
Löbstedter Strasse 47b
07749 Jena / DE
Inventor(s)01 / GROSSWIG, Stephan
Georg-Weerth-Strasse 4
D-07749 Jena / DE
02 / KÜHN, Katrin
Max-Gräfe-Gasse 10
D-07743 Jena / DE
 [2001/09]
Representative(s)Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/09]Meissner, Bolte & Partner
Anwaltssozietät GbR Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date99924909.707.05.1999
[2001/09]
WO1999EP03162
Priority number, dateDE1998208836U15.05.1998         Original published format: DE 29808836 U
DE1998211737U01.07.1998         Original published format: DE 29811737 U
[2001/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9960360
Date:25.11.1999
Language:DE
[1999/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1078235
Date:28.02.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999
[2001/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1078235
Date:30.03.2005
Language:DE
[2005/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01M3/00, G01M3/04
[2001/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/09]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM MONITORING VON TEMPERATURVERTEILUNGEN AUF DER BASIS VERTEILTER FASEROPTISCHER SENSORIK[2004/39]
English:DEVICE FOR MONITORING TEMPERATURE DISTRIBUTIONS ON THE BASIS OF DISTRIBUTED FIBER-OPTIC SENSING[2004/39]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR LA SURVEILLANCE DE REPARTITIONS DE TEMPERATURE FONDEE SUR L'UTILISATION D'UN SYSTEME DE MESURE A FIBRE OPTIQUE REPARTI[2004/39]
Former [2001/09]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM MONITORING VON TEMPERATURVERTEILUNGEN AUF DER BASIS VERTEILTER FASEROPTISCHER SENSORIK SOWIE DEREN ANWENDUNG
Former [2001/09]METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MONITORING TEMPERATURE DISTRIBUTIONS ON THE BASIS OF DISTRIBUTED FIBER-OPTIC SENSING, AND USE OF SAME
Former [2001/09]PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA SURVEILLANCE DE REPARTITIONS DE TEMPERATURE FONDEE SUR L'UTILISATION D'UN SYSTEME DE MESURE A FIBRE OPTIQUE REPARTI, ET MISES EN OEUVRE DUDIT PROCEDE
Entry into regional phase09.10.2000National basic fee paid 
09.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
09.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/09]
20.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2005Fee for grant paid
25.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT30.03.2005
NL30.03.2005
BE31.05.2005
DK30.06.2005
[2008/18]
Former [2006/25]NL30.03.2005
BE31.05.2005
DK30.06.2005
Former [2006/14]NL30.03.2005
DK30.06.2005
Former [2006/13]DK30.06.2005
Cited inInternational search[E]DE29811737U  (GESO GES FUER SENSORIK GEOTECH [DE]) [E] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [E]DE29821223U  (GTC KAPPELMEYER GMBH [DE]) [E] 1,14 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE19621797  (GTC KAPPELMEYER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,13 * column 6, line 24 - column 7, line 11; figures 2-5 *;
 [X]DE19702126  (GESO GES FUER SENSORIK GEOTECH [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE19509129  (GESO GES FUER SENSORIK GEOTECH [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5663490  (KOZEN TORU [JP]) [A] 1,13,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH07317215
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 096, no. 004, [A] 1,15 * abstract *