Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1008280

EP1008280 - CONTACTING UNIT FOR A CARD-SHAPED CARRYING ELEMENT OF ELECTRONIC MODULES, ESPECIALLY ACCORDING TO PCMCIA STANDARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.2005
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.06.2005  [2005/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STOCKO Contact GmbH & Co. KG
Simonshöfchen 31
42327 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]For all designated states
Stocko Contact GmbH & Co. KG
Simonshöfchen 31
42327 Wuppertal / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KLATT, Dieter
Am Schlagbaum 27
D-42489 Wülfrath / DE
[2000/24]
Representative(s)Rausch Wanischeck-Bergmann Brinkmann
Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte
Am Seestern 8
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte
Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date99925031.925.05.1999
[2000/24]
WO1999EP03560
Priority number, dateDE1998211425U29.06.1998         Original published format: DE 29811425 U
[2000/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0001210
Date:06.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1008280
Date:14.06.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2000
[2000/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1008280
Date:09.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:H05K7/12
[2000/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/24]
TitleGerman:KONTAKTIEREINHEIT FÜR EIN KARTENFÖRMIGES TRÄGERELEMENT ELEKTRONISCHER BAUGRUPPEN, INSBESONDERE NACH PCMCIA-NORM[2000/24]
English:CONTACTING UNIT FOR A CARD-SHAPED CARRYING ELEMENT OF ELECTRONIC MODULES, ESPECIALLY ACCORDING TO PCMCIA STANDARDS[2000/24]
French:UNITE DE MISE EN CONTACT POUR UN ELEMENT DE SUPPORT EN FORME DE CARTE DE MODULES ELECTRONIQUES, EN PARTICULIER CORRESPONDANT A LA NORME PCMCIA[2000/24]
Entry into regional phase31.01.2000National basic fee paid 
31.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/24]
03.11.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.02.2004Fee for grant paid
06.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
08.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO9642063  (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,12-15 * abstract * [Y] 4-11;
 [XY]DE29607253U  (STOCKO METALLWARENFAB HENKELS [DE]) [X] 1,12-15 * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 21; figure 1; claim 3 * [Y] 4,6-11;
 [XY]FR2753597  (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,15 * abstract * [Y] 4,6-11;
 [YA]EP0791890  (NEIFER WOLFGANG [DE]) [Y] 4-11 * figures 1,2 * [A] 1;
 [Y]DE29621835U  (CONSTIN DESIGN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4,6-11 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE29718773U  (STOCKO METALLWARENFAB HENKELS [DE]) [A] 15 * page 5, line 21 - line 34; figure 2; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9710566  (ELONEX PLC [GB]) [A] 1,2 * page 7, line 1 - line 14; figure 4C *;
 [A]DE4432028  (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 1,2 * figures 3-6 *