Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1082518

EP1082518 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SEPARATING AND INJECTING GAS IN A WELLBORE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.05.2004
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.07.2004  [2004/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ConocoPhillips Company
216 Patent Library Building
Bartlesville Technology Center
Bartlesville, OK 74004 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
ConocoPhillips Company
216 Patent Library Building, Bartlesville Technology Center
Bartlesville, OK 74004 / US
Former [2002/05]For all designated states
PHILLIPS PETROLEUM COMPANY
5th and Keeler
Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US
Former [2001/11]For all designated states
ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY
2300 W. Plano Parkway
Plano, TX 75075 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BRADY, Jerry
10601 Lone Tree Drive
Anchorage, AK 99516 / US
02 / STEVENSON, Mark
7621 Highlander Drive
Anchorage, AK 99518 / US
03 / KLEIN, John
13550 Vern Drive
Anchorage, AK 99516 / US
04 / CAWVEY, James
2231 Loren Circle
Anchorage, AK 99516 / US
 [2001/11]
Representative(s)Bublak, Wolfgang , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/22]Bublak, Wolfgang, Dr. , et al
Bardehle, Pagenberg, Dost, Altenburg, Geissler, Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [2002/19]Ricker, Mathias, Dr.Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg- Geissler & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Former [2002/16]Bardehle, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [2002/01]Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Former [2001/11]Bradley, Josephine Mary , et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date99925149.927.05.1999
[2001/11]
WO1999GB01675
Priority number, dateUS1998008849901.06.1998         Original published format: US 88499
[2001/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9963201
Date:09.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1082518
Date:14.03.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999
[2001/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1082518
Date:16.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/29]
Search report(s)International search reportEP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:E21B43/38
[2001/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   GB,   NL [2001/11]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTNG ZUM TRENNEN UND INJIZIEREN VON GAS IN EINEM BOHRLOCH[2001/11]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SEPARATING AND INJECTING GAS IN A WELLBORE[2001/11]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR LA SEPARATION ET L'INJECTION DE GAZ DANS UN FORAGE[2001/11]
Entry into regional phase27.12.2000National basic fee paid 
27.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
27.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/11]
06.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.04.2003Fee for grant paid
14.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
06.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
07.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]US5450901  (ELLWOOD DAVID E [US]) [A] 1,3,5,9,13,19,23 * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 14; figure - *;
 [A]GB2302892  (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [AD]US5431228  (WEINGARTEN JEAN S [US], et al) [AD] 1 * column A; figure - *;
 [PA]US5794697  (WOLFLICK JOHN R [US], et al) [PA] 1,3,5,9,13,19,23 * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 30; figure - *
 [AD]  - WEINGARTEN, "New Design for Compact Liquid-Gas Partial Separation: Downhole and Surface Installations for Artificial Lift Applications", SPE 30637, Dallas, (19951022), pages 73 - 81, XP002115207 [AD] 1,3,5,9,13,19,23 * abstract *
by applicantUS5431228