Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1091710

EP1091710 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSFORMING A TWO-DIMENSIONAL SANITARY NAPKIN INTO A THREE-DIMENSIONAL ONE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2003
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/16]For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / AOUAD, Yousef
6394 Grand Vista Avenue
Cincinnati, OH 45213 / US
02 / BIEN, Denise, Jean
1046 Boyton Place
Cincinnati, OH 45208 / US
03 / ALVIS, Cynthia, Lee
2298 Canary Lane
Fairfield, OH 45014 / US
 [2001/29]
Former [2001/16]01 / AOUAD, Yousef
6394 Grand Vista Avenue
Cincinnati, OH 45213 / US
02 / BIEN, Denise, Jean
1028 Richwood Circle
Cincinnati, OH 45208 / US
03 / ALVIS, Cynthia, Lee
2298 Canary Lane
Fairfield, OH 45014 / US
Representative(s)Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H. , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/16]Hirsch, Uwe Thomas , et al
Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date99925239.824.06.1999
[2001/16]
WO1999IB01187
Priority number, dateUS1998010737530.06.1998         Original published format: US 107375
[2001/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0000121
Date:06.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1091710
Date:18.04.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2000
[2001/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1091710
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15
[2001/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UMFORMUNG EINER ZWEIDIMENSIONALEN DAMENBINDE IN EINE DREIDIMENSIONALE DAMENBINDE[2001/16]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSFORMING A TWO-DIMENSIONAL SANITARY NAPKIN INTO A THREE-DIMENSIONAL ONE[2001/16]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSFORMATION D'UNE SERVIETTE HYGIENIQUE BIDIMENSIONNELLE EN UNE SERVIETTE HYGIENIQUE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE[2001/16]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2000National basic fee paid 
11.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/16]
20.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.2002Fee for grant paid
17.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.11.2002
BE27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
FR27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
IT27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
DK27.02.2003
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
CY24.06.2003
IE24.06.2003
LU24.06.2003
[2008/18]
Former [2007/23]AT27.11.2002
BE27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
FR27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
DK27.02.2003
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
CY24.06.2003
IE24.06.2003
LU24.06.2003
Former [2006/14]AT27.11.2002
BE27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
FR27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
CY24.06.2003
IE24.06.2003
LU24.06.2003
Former [2004/39]AT27.11.2002
BE27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
CY24.06.2003
IE24.06.2003
LU24.06.2003
Former [2004/36]AT27.11.2002
BE27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
CY24.06.2003
IE24.06.2003
Former [2004/29]AT27.11.2002
BE27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
IE24.06.2003
Former [2004/05]AT27.11.2002
BE27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2003/51]AT27.11.2002
BE27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
Former [2003/43]AT27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
Former [2003/39]AT27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
Former [2003/37]AT27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
Former [2003/31]GR27.11.2002
NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
Former [2003/30]NL27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
Former [2003/29]PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
Former [2003/19]SE27.02.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]DE564905  (ADOLFINE VERFUERTH GEB BARTH) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9517150  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-5,7-9 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0651986  (KAYSERSBERG SA [FR]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US5127911  (BAHARAV EVA [US]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *
by applicantUS5300055
 US5688259
 US5545156
 US5624423
 US4950264
 US4425130