Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035647

EP1035647 - TWO-FREQUENCY IMPEDANCE MATCHING CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  31.12.2004
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.12.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 16.02.2005  [2005/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OHSHIMA, Takeshi, Mitsubishi Denki K. K.
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / UCHIDA, Hiromitsu, Mitsubishi Denki K. K.
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
03 / ITOH, Yasushi, Mitsubishi Denki K. K.
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner
Mozartstrasse 17
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99925296.810.06.1999
[2000/37]
WO1999JP03113
Priority number, dateJP1998024398928.08.1998         Original published format: JP 24398998
[2000/37]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0013315
Date:09.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1035647
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2000
[2000/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP09.03.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.2004
ClassificationInternational:H03H7/38, H03H7/075
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/37]
TitleGerman:IMPEDANZANPASSUNGSSCHALTUNG FÜR ZWEI FREQUENZEN[2000/37]
English:TWO-FREQUENCY IMPEDANCE MATCHING CIRCUIT[2000/37]
French:CIRCUIT D'ADAPTATION D'IMPEDANCE A DEUX FREQUENCES[2000/37]
Entry into regional phase20.01.2000Translation filed 
20.01.2000National basic fee paid 
20.01.2000Search fee paid 
20.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
20.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
23.12.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XA]  H. NIELINGER, "OPTIMALE DIMENSIONIERUNG VON BREITBANDANPASSUNGSNETZWERKEN", NACHRICHTENTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, (196802), vol. 21, no. 2, pages 88 - 91, XP002303052 [X] 1,5 * table 2 * [A] 3,7
 [XA]  V.D. KUZNETSOV, "BROADCAST TRANSMITTER-ANTENNA MATCHING", TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND RADIO ENGINEERING, (197212), vol. 26/27, no. 12, pages 28 - 31, XP002303053 [X] 1,5 * figures 1C,D * [A] 3,7
International search[Y]JPS4626081Y  ;
 [Y]JPH05121988  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [Y]JPS58178617  (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO);
 [Y]JPS63102512  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH06252791  (NEC CORP, et al);
 [Y]JPH05206888  (NEC CORP);
 [Y]WO9629756  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]);
 [A]JPH06244756  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP);
 [A]JPS5429949  (DENKI KOGYO CO LTD)
 [Y]  - 1997 Nen Denshi Jouhou Tsuushin Gakkai Sougou Zenkoku Taikai Kouen Rombunshuu Electronics 1, issued 06 March 1997, HIROKI NAKAJIMA, MASAHIRO MURAGUCHI, KOUEN BANGOU C-2-20, "lambda/4 stub o mochiita nishuuhasuutai douji seigou kairo to MMIC koutaiiki (30-60GHz) zouhabaki heno ouyou", (Dual-Frequency Matching Technique,
 [Y]  - H. NAKAJIMA, M. MURAGUCHI, "Dual-Frequency Matching Technique and Its Application to an Octave-Band (30-60GHz) MMIC Amplifier", IEICE TRANS ELECTRON, (199712), vol. E80-C, no. 12, pages 1614 - 1621, XP002923172