Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1027772

EP1027772 - CHANNEL CODING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR RATE MATCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  14.01.2011
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.01.2011Refusal of applicationpublished on 16.02.2011  [2011/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-dong
Paldal-gu
Suwon City, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2000/33]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon City, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / PARK, Chang Soo
72-2, Munjong-dong, Songpa-gu
Seoul 138-202 / KR
02 / LEE, Hyeon Woo
Byeoksan Apt. 806-901, Kwonson-dong, Kwonson-gu
Suwon-shi, Kyonggi-do 441-390 / KR
[2000/33]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/32]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/33]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Martinistrasse 24
28195 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date99925431.105.06.1999
[2000/33]
WO1999KR00278
Priority number, dateKR1998002099005.06.1998         Original published format: KR 199820990
[2006/01]
Former [2000/33]KR1999000009805.06.1998
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9965148
Date:16.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1027772
Date:16.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.1999
[2000/33]
Search report(s)International search reportAT16.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H03M13/00
[2000/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/33]
TitleGerman:KANALKODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND METHODE ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNGSRATENANPASSUNG[2000/33]
English:CHANNEL CODING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR RATE MATCHING[2000/33]
French:DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE DE CANAL ET METHODE D'ADAPTATION DE DEBIT[2000/33]
Entry into regional phase06.03.2000National basic fee paid 
16.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
16.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
04.10.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
07.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2007Date of oral proceedings
17.04.2007Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/07]
17.04.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
10.11.2010Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/07]
Appeal following examination27.06.2007Appeal received No.  T1521/07
27.08.2007Statement of grounds filed
10.11.2010Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
10.11.2010Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
29.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
29.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
30.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
30.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
26.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[A]US5721745  (HLADIK STEPHEN MICHAEL [US], et al);
 [A]US5446747  (BERROU CLAUDE [FR])