Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1077967

EP1077967 - BIPHENYL OXO-ACETIC ACIDS USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF INSULIN RESISTANCE AND HYPERGLYCEMIA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.10.2003
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wyeth
Five Giralda Farms
Madison, NJ 07940-0874 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/25]For all designated states
Wyeth
Five Giralda Farms
Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US
Former [2001/09]For all designated states
AMERICAN HOME PRODUCTS CORPORATION
Five Giralda Farms
Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MALAMAS, Michael, Sotirios
2443 Oleander Circle
Jamison, PA 18929 / US
02 / McDEVITT, Robert, Emmett
232 Haworth Place
Somerset, NJ 08873 / US
03 / ADEBAYO, Folake, Oluwemimo
216 Dorchester Drive
Cranbury, NJ 08512 / US
 [2001/09]
Representative(s)Walters, Philip Bernard William , et al
Wyeth Laboratories
Patents & Trade Marks Department
Huntercombe Lane South
Taplow
Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/09]Walters, Philip Bernard William , et al
Wyeth Laboratories, Patents & Trade Marks Department, Huntercombe Lane South, Taplow
Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB
Application number, filing date99925583.910.05.1999
[2001/09]
WO1999US10201
Priority number, dateUS1998007620512.05.1998         Original published format: US 76205
[2001/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9958518
Date:18.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1077967
Date:28.02.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999
[2001/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1077967
Date:04.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07D307/80, C07D333/56, C07D235/12, C07D333/16, C07D417/06, C07D491/04, C07D409/12, C07D405/12, C07D471/04, A61K31/34, A61K31/38, A61K31/415, A61K31/44, // (C07D491/04, 307:00), C07D221:00,(C07D471/04, 235:00), C07D221:00
[2001/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/09]
Extension statesAL24.10.2000
LT24.10.2000
LV24.10.2000
RO24.10.2000
SI24.10.2000
TitleGerman:ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON INSULIN-RESISTENZ UND HYPERGLYCEMIE GEEIGNETE BIPHENYL-OXO-ESSIGSÄUREN[2001/09]
English:BIPHENYL OXO-ACETIC ACIDS USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF INSULIN RESISTANCE AND HYPERGLYCEMIA[2001/09]
French:ACIDES BIPHENYL-OXO-ACETIQUES UTILES DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE L'INSULINORESISTANCE ET DE L'HYPERGLYCEMIE[2001/09]
Entry into regional phase24.10.2000National basic fee paid 
24.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
24.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/09]
27.10.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2002Fee for grant paid
30.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
06.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.12.2002
BE04.12.2002
FI04.12.2002
FR04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
IT04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
DK04.03.2003
SE04.03.2003
DE05.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
CY10.05.2003
GB10.05.2003
LU10.05.2003
IE12.05.2003
CH31.05.2003
LI31.05.2003
ES27.06.2003
[2008/18]
Former [2006/14]AT04.12.2002
BE04.12.2002
FI04.12.2002
FR04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
DK04.03.2003
SE04.03.2003
DE05.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
CY10.05.2003
GB10.05.2003
LU10.05.2003
IE12.05.2003
CH31.05.2003
LI31.05.2003
ES27.06.2003
Former [2004/39]AT04.12.2002
BE04.12.2002
FI04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
DK04.03.2003
SE04.03.2003
DE05.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
CY10.05.2003
GB10.05.2003
LU10.05.2003
IE12.05.2003
CH31.05.2003
LI31.05.2003
ES27.06.2003
Former [2004/36]AT04.12.2002
BE04.12.2002
FI04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
DK04.03.2003
SE04.03.2003
DE05.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
CY10.05.2003
GB10.05.2003
IE12.05.2003
CH31.05.2003
LI31.05.2003
ES27.06.2003
Former [2004/29]AT04.12.2002
BE04.12.2002
FI04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
DK04.03.2003
SE04.03.2003
DE05.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
GB10.05.2003
IE12.05.2003
CH31.05.2003
LI31.05.2003
ES27.06.2003
Former [2004/22]AT04.12.2002
BE04.12.2002
FI04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
DK04.03.2003
SE04.03.2003
DE05.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
GB10.05.2003
CH31.05.2003
LI31.05.2003
ES27.06.2003
Former [2004/05]AT04.12.2002
BE04.12.2002
FI04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
DK04.03.2003
SE04.03.2003
DE05.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
Former [2004/02]AT04.12.2002
BE04.12.2002
FI04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
DK04.03.2003
SE04.03.2003
DE05.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
Former [2003/51]AT04.12.2002
BE04.12.2002
FI04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
SE04.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
Former [2003/43]AT04.12.2002
FI04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
SE04.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
Former [2003/37]AT04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
SE04.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
Former [2003/31]GR04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
SE04.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
Former [2003/30]NL04.12.2002
SE04.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
Former [2003/29]SE04.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
Former [2003/27]SE04.03.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0499222  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1 * page 27, compound (1-75); claim 9, especially formula (IIba) *;
 [A]WO9716442  (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1,79 * claims 1,14,19,39 *;
 [A]EP0818453  (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [A] 1,79 * claims 1,4 *;
 [A]WO9117163  (PFIZER [US]) [A] 1,79 * claims 1,29 *;
 [A]WO9721435  (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1,79 * examples 18C,18D; claims 1,19,23 *