Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1080364

EP1080364 - MULTI-CHANNEL OPTICAL DETECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2003
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 06.06.2007  [2007/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cepheid
1190 Borregas Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
[2001/10]
Inventor(s)01 / CHRISTEL, Lee, A.
3747 La Donna Street
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
02 / NORTHRUP, M., Allen
616 Vistamont Avenue
Berkeley, CA 94708 / US
03 / PETERSEN, Kurt, E.
3655 Valley Ridge Lane
San Jose, CA 95148 / US
04 / MCMILLAN, William, A.
8051 Presidio Drive
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
05 / KOVACS, Gregory, T., A.
105 Peter Coutts Circle
Stanford, CA 94305 / US
06 / YOUNG, Steven, J.
105 Milani Court
Los Altos, CA 95030 / US
07 / CHANG, Ronald
3312 Hoover Street
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
08 / DORITY, Douglas, B.
25 Castle Rock Drive
Mill Valley, CA 94941 / US
09 / HEBERT, Raymond
17550 Old Summit Road
Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US
10 / KINTZ, Gregory, J.
680 Emily Drive
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
 [2001/10]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/10]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99925705.819.05.1999
[2001/10]
WO1999US11182
Priority number, dateUS1998008126019.05.1998         Original published format: US 81260
[2001/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9960380
Date:25.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1080364
Date:07.03.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999
[2001/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1080364
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/03
[2001/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/10]
TitleGerman:MEHRKANALIGES OPTISCHES DETEKTIONSSYSTEM[2001/10]
English:MULTI-CHANNEL OPTICAL DETECTION SYSTEM[2001/10]
French:SYSTEME DE DETECTION OPTIQUE A PLUSIEURS VOIES[2001/10]
Entry into regional phase22.11.2000National basic fee paid 
22.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.11.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/10]
21.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2002Fee for grant paid
10.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
06.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.11.2002
BE20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
DK20.02.2003
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
CY19.05.2003
IE19.05.2003
LU19.05.2003
MC31.05.2003
[2007/23]
Former [2005/02]AT20.11.2002
BE20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
CY19.05.2003
IE19.05.2003
LU19.05.2003
MC31.05.2003
Former [2004/39]AT20.11.2002
BE20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
CY19.05.2003
IE19.05.2003
LU19.05.2003
Former [2004/36]AT20.11.2002
BE20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
CY19.05.2003
IE19.05.2003
Former [2004/29]AT20.11.2002
BE20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
IE19.05.2003
Former [2003/51]AT20.11.2002
BE20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/43]AT20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/39]AT20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/37]AT20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/31]GR20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/30]NL20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/29]PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/19]SE20.02.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]US5595708  (BERNDT KLAUS W [US]) [A] 1-50 * figure 7 *;
 [A]WO9708523  (VIVORX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-50 * figure 6 *;
 [A]EP0516274  (KOWA CO [JP]) [A] 1-50 * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9735176  (UNIV UTAH RES FOUND [US], et al) [A] 1-50 * figure 24 *;
 [A]US4074939  (RABL CARL-ROLAND) [A] 1-50 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5589136  (NORTHRUP M ALLEN [US], et al) [A] 1-50 * figures 15,16 *;
 [A]US5073029  (EBERLY JAMES P [US], et al) [A] 1-50 * figure 5 *;
 [A]US5618495  (MOUNT ANDREW S [US], et al) [A] 1-50 * figure 1 *