Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1102716

EP1102716 - PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR CUTTING OF DISCRETE COMPONENTS OF A MULTI-COMPONENT WORKPIECE AND DEPOSITING THEM WITH REGISTRATION ON A MOVING WEB OF MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.03.2005
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, Wisconsin 54956-0349 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RAJALA, Gregory, John
724 Kensington Road
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
 [2001/22]
Representative(s)Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]Davies, Christopher Robert
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date99925785.024.05.1999
[2001/22]
WO1999US11437
Priority number, dateUS1998008835401.06.1998         Original published format: US 88354
[2001/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9962801
Date:09.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1102716
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999
[2001/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1102716
Date:28.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B65H9/00
[2001/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2001/22]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHNEIDEN VON DISKRETEN KOMPONENTEN VON EINEM MEHRKOMPONENTEN-WERKSTÜCK UND DEREN REGISTERGERECHTEN ANBRINGEN AUF EINE LAUFENDE MATERIALBAHN[2001/22]
English:PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR CUTTING OF DISCRETE COMPONENTS OF A MULTI-COMPONENT WORKPIECE AND DEPOSITING THEM WITH REGISTRATION ON A MOVING WEB OF MATERIAL[2001/22]
French:COUPE DE COMPOSANTS DISCRETS D'UNE PIECE MULTICOMPOSANT, PRESENTATION EXACTE DE CES COMPOSANTS SUR UNE BANDE CIRCULANTE DE MATERIAU, ET APPAREIL A CET EFFET[2001/22]
Entry into regional phase22.12.2000National basic fee paid 
22.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/22]
03.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
02.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2004Fee for grant paid
26.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16]
Request for further processing for:02.07.2003Request for further processing filed
02.07.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.07.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
06.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
07.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]US5415716  (KENDALL JEFFREY D [US]) [A] 1,9,16,18;
 [A]US5702551  (HUBER MICHAEL T [US], et al) [A] 1,9,16,18;
 [A]WO9623470  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1,9,16,18;
 [A]US5591297  (AHR NICHOLAS A [US]) [A] 1,9,16,18;
 [A]US5407513  (HAYDEN MICHAEL P [US], et al) [A] 1,9,16,18;
 [A]US5244530  (COLLINS ALFRED L [US], et al) [A] 1,9,16,18;
 [A]US5716478  (BOOTHE JUDSON LAMAR [US], et al) [A] 1,9,16,18;
 [A]US4061527  (TRAISE JOHN E) [A] 1,9,16,18