Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099130

EP1099130 - POST-FORMING CONTINUOUS/DISPERSE PHASE OPTICAL BODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  14.01.2005
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MERRILL, William, W.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
02 / ALLEN, Richard, C.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
03 / CONDO, Peter, D.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
04 / BENSON, Olester, Jr.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2001/20]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date99925813.025.05.1999
[2001/20]
WO1999US11499
Priority number, dateUS1998012731431.07.1998         Original published format: US 127314
[2001/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0007043
Date:10.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1099130
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000
[2001/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:G02B5/30, G02F1/1335, G02B5/08
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesDE [2001/20]
TitleGerman:NACHFORMBARE OPTISCHE GEGENSTAENDE MIT KONTINUIERLICHER DISPERSER PHASE[2001/20]
English:POST-FORMING CONTINUOUS/DISPERSE PHASE OPTICAL BODIES[2001/20]
French:CORPS OPTIQUES A PHASE CONTINUE/DISPERSEE POUR POST-FORMAGE[2001/20]
Entry into regional phase26.02.2001National basic fee paid 
26.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
26.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
05.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2003Date of oral proceedings
02.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2005/09]
02.12.2003Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
02.01.2005Application refused, date of legal effect [2005/09]
Appeal following examination04.02.2004Appeal received No.  T0661/04
20.12.2004Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant inadmissible
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US5217794  (SCHRENK WALTER J [US]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US5783120  (OUDERKIRK ANDREW J [US], et al) [DA] 1-9 * column 6, line 42 - column 21, line 25; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US5448404  (SCHRENK WALTER J [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 7, line 23 - column 10, line 16 * * column 11, line 50 - column 12, line 32; figure 14; claim 18 *;
 [A]US4080046  (NISHIZAKI MASASHI) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 48 * * column 5, line 3 - line 28; figures 2,5,7 *;
 [DA]US5759467  (CARTER BRANDT K [US], et al) [DA] 1-9 * column 4, line 15 - column 10, line 39 *