Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1084132

EP1084132 - REDOX REVERSIBLE IMIDAZOLE-OSMIUM COMPLEX CONJUGATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.05.2003
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 26.11.2003  [2003/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Roche Diagnostics Corporation
9115 Hague Road
Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US
[2001/12]
Inventor(s)01 / BUCK, Harvey, B., Jr.
8147 Bay Brook Drive
Indianapolis, IN 46256 / US
02 / DENG, Zhi, D.
13722 Goldfinch Drive
Carmel, IN 46032 / US
 [2001/12]
Representative(s)Jung, Michael , et al
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/12]Jung, Michael, Dr. , et al
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung
68298 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date99925981.528.05.1999
[2001/12]
WO1999US11855
Priority number, dateUS19980087576P01.06.1998         Original published format: US 87576 P
[2001/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9962918
Date:09.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1084132
Date:21.03.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999
[2001/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1084132
Date:24.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07F15/00, G01N33/58, G01N33/72, C07K5/10, C07K14/805
[2001/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/12]
TitleGerman:REDOX-REVERSIBLE IMIDAZOL-OSMIUMKOMPLEX-KONJUGATE[2001/12]
English:REDOX REVERSIBLE IMIDAZOLE-OSMIUM COMPLEX CONJUGATES[2001/12]
French:CONJUGUES D'UN COMPLEXE IMIDAZOLE-OSMIUM A OXYDO-REDUCTION REVERSIBLE[2001/12]
Entry into regional phase18.11.2000National basic fee paid 
18.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/12]
26.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.2002Fee for grant paid
16.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.04.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.07.2002
BE24.07.2002
CH24.07.2002
FI24.07.2002
GR24.07.2002
LI24.07.2002
NL24.07.2002
DK24.10.2002
SE24.10.2002
PT29.10.2002
[2003/48]
Former [2003/46]AT24.07.2002
CH24.07.2002
FI24.07.2002
GR24.07.2002
LI24.07.2002
NL24.07.2002
DK24.10.2002
SE24.10.2002
PT29.10.2002
Former [2003/31]AT24.07.2002
CH24.07.2002
FI24.07.2002
GR24.07.2002
LI24.07.2002
NL24.07.2002
SE24.10.2002
PT29.10.2002
Former [2003/22]FI24.07.2002
GR24.07.2002
NL24.07.2002
SE24.10.2002
PT29.10.2002
Former [2003/20]FI24.07.2002
GR24.07.2002
NL24.07.2002
SE24.10.2002
Former [2003/14]FI24.07.2002
NL24.07.2002
SE24.10.2002
Former [2003/10]NL24.07.2002
SE24.10.2002
Former [2003/03]SE24.10.2002
Cited inInternational search[DXA]US5589326  (DENG ZHI D [US], et al) [DX] 1-7 * the whole document * [A] 8-13;
 [DA]US4945045  (FORREST GORDON C [GB], et al) [DA] 1,8,10-17 * example 1 *;
 [A]WO9325907  (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [A] 1,8,10-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9414066  (UNIV MANCHESTER [GB], et al) [A] 1,8,10-17 * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 2; claims 1-6 *;
 [A]DE4344646  (SCHELLER FRIEDER PROF DR [DE]) [A] 1,8,10-17 * example 1 *;
 [A]WO9701097  (SEREX INC [US]) [A] 1,8,10-17 * example 3 *;
 [A]  - A J NIELSON, W P GRIFFITH, "Reactions of Osmium Tetroxide with Protein Side Chains and Unsaturated Lipids", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, DALTON TRANSACTIONS, (1979), pages 1084 - 1088, XP002114931 [A] 1-17 * the whole document *