Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1084522

EP1084522 - HIGH FREQUENCY ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY SUCH AS A MULTI-PORT MULTI-LEVEL CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.07.2005
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.09.2005  [2005/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bel Fuse Ltd.
Luk Hop Industrial Building, 8 Luk Hop Street, 8th Floor, San Po Kong
Kowloon, Hong Kong / CN
[N/P]
Former [2003/42]For all designated states
Bel Fuse Ltd.
Luk Hop Industrial Building, 8 Luk Hop Street, 8th Floor, San Po Kong
Kowloon, Hong Kong / CN
Former [2001/12]For all designated states
Stewart Connector Systems
11118 Susquehanna Trail South
Glen Rock, PA 17327 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MECKLEY, Ted
258 Lindy Road
Seven Valleys, PA 17360-9299 / US
02 / LOCATI, Ronald
2701 Ferncreek Lane
York, PA 17404 / US
03 / HULBERT, Patrick
1266 Rawlinsville Road
New Providence, PA 17560 / US
 [2001/12]
Representative(s)Salonen, Esko Tapani , et al
Forssén & Salomaa Oy
Lautatarhankatu 8 B
00580 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2001/12]Salonen, Esko Tapani , et al
Forssén & Salomaa Oy, Yrjönkatu 30
00100 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date99926058.102.06.1999
[2001/12]
WO1999US11997
Priority number, dateUS19980087643P02.06.1998         Original published format: US 87643 P
[2001/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9963630
Date:09.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1084522
Date:21.03.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999
[2001/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.12.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:H01R24/04
[2003/36]
Former International [2001/12]H01R3/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/12]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHE VERBINDERVORRICHTUNG FÜR HOHE FREQUENZEN WIE ZUM BEISPIEL MEHRFACHVERBINDER AUF MEHREREN EBENEN[2004/49]
English:HIGH FREQUENCY ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY SUCH AS A MULTI-PORT MULTI-LEVEL CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY[2001/12]
French:ENSEMBLE CONNECTEUR ELECTRIQUE HAUTE FREQUENCE TEL QU'UN ENSEMBLE CONNECTEUR MULTI-NIVEAU MULTI-PORT[2001/12]
Former [2001/12]ELEKTRISCHE VERBINDERVORRICHTUNGFÜR HOHE FREQUENZEN WIE ZUM BEISPIEL MEHRFACHVERBINDER AUF MEHREREN EBENEN
Entry into regional phase28.11.2000National basic fee paid 
28.11.2000Search fee paid 
28.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/12]
19.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/37]
12.04.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
17.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
11.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US4296550  (KOBLER ROBERT J) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 5 - line 50; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5687478  (BELOPOLSKY YAKOV [US]) [A] 1,2 * figure 3 *
International search[A]US4641901  (BRENNAN ROBERT J [US], et al);
 [A]US4806117  (JOHNSTON JAMES J [US]);
 [A]US4904209  (NELSON RICHARD A [US]);
 [A]US5226835  (BAKER III FRANK P [US], et al);
 [A]US5697815  (DREWNICKI RICHARD [GB])