Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1082047

EP1082047 - Dispenser and adapter for coreless rolls of products [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/11]DISPENSER ADAPTER FOR CORELESS ROLLS OF PRODUCTS
[2010/41]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.04.2011
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.05.2011  [2011/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Former [2003/43]For all designated states
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US
Former [2001/11]For all designated states
Kimberley-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PHELPS, Stephen, Lawrence
600 Daisy Nash Drive
Lilburn, GA 30047 / US
02 / GARCIA, Arthur, J.
613 Prospect Avenue
Morrisville, PA 19069 / US
 [2001/11]
Representative(s)Mabey, Katherine Frances , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/15]Mabey, Katherine Frances , et al
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2001/11]Davies, Christopher Robert , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date99926061.528.05.1999
[2001/11]
WO1999US12012
Priority number, dateUS19980087275P29.05.1998         Original published format: US 87275 P
US1999029841623.04.1999         Original published format: US 298416
[2001/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9960909
Date:02.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1082047
Date:14.03.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999
[2001/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:A47K10/40
[2001/11]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2001/11]
TitleGerman:Spender und Adapter für kernlose Produktrolle[2010/41]
English:Dispenser and adapter for coreless rolls of products[2010/41]
French:Distributeur et adaptateur pour des produits en rouleau sans bobine[2010/43]
Former [2001/11]SPENDERADAPTER FÜR KERNLOSE PRODUKTROLLE
Former [2001/11]DISPENSER ADAPTER FOR CORELESS ROLLS OF PRODUCTS
Former [2001/11]ADAPTATEUR POUR DISTRIBUTEUR DE PRODUITS EN ROULEAU SANS BOBINE
Entry into regional phase22.12.2000National basic fee paid 
22.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.12.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/11]
03.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/21]
01.02.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/21]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.12.2003
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
06.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
07.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
05.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
13.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
07.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201012   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO9912462  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [XP] 1,2,4-14,16-20 * the whole document *;
 [X]US3878998  (LAZZARI GILBERT A) [X] 1,2,4,9-11,14,16,17 * column W *;
 [XD]US2905404  (SIMMONS WALTER J) [XD] 9-11,14,16-18 * column W *;
 [A]US5277375  (DEARWESTER DONALD D [US]) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]US5620148  (MITCHELL JOSEPH [US]) [A] 9 * figure 3 *;
 [A]EP0729724  (SCOTT PAPER CO [US]) [A] 9 * the whole document *
Examination US4662576
by applicantUS2905404
 US390084