Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1089906

EP1089906 - STEERING ARRANGEMENT FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  15.02.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 02.04.2003  [2003/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sauer-Danfoss Holding A/S
Nordborgvej 81
6430 Nordborg / DK
[2002/19]
Former [2001/42]For all designated states
Sauer-Danfoss (Nordeborg) A/S
Nordborgvej 81
6430 Nordborg / DK
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
Danfoss Fluid Power A/S
Nordborgvej 81
6430 Nordborg / DK
Inventor(s)01 / BLOCH, Jesper
Sandvej 31
DK-6430 Nordborg / DK
02 / STERG RD, Ulla, Toft
H. Pontoppidansgade 8
DK-8000 Aarhus / DK
 [2001/15]
Representative(s)Nissen, Georg , et al
Danfoss Universe A/S
Mads Patent Vej 1
6430 Nordborg / DK
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]Nissen, Georg , et al
c/o Danfoss A/G, Patent Department
6430 Nordborg / DK
Application number, filing date99926292.622.06.1999
[2001/15]
WO1999DK00343
Priority number, dateDE199812778123.06.1998         Original published format: DE 19827781
[2001/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9967118
Date:29.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1089906
Date:11.04.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.1999
[2001/15]
Search report(s)International search reportSE29.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B62D1/00
[2001/15]
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/15]
TitleGerman:LENKEINRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG[2001/15]
English:STEERING ARRANGEMENT FOR A VEHICLE[2001/15]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DIRECTION POUR VEHICULE[2001/15]
Entry into regional phase28.11.2000National basic fee paid 
28.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
28.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/15]
23.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0479735  (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]);
 [A]US5035439  (PETRILLO PATRICK G [US])