Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1029394

EP1029394 - METHOD FOR GENERATING A RANDOM NUMBER ON A QUANTUM-MECHANICS BASIS AND RANDOM GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.01.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deutsche Telekom AG
Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140
53113 Bonn / DE
[2000/34]
Inventor(s)01 / DULTZ, Wolfgang
Marienbergerstrasse 37
D-65936 Frankfurt am Main / DE
02 / DULTZ, Gisela
Marienbergerstrasse 37
D-65936 Frankfurt am Main / DE
03 / HILDEBRANDT, Eric
Ginnheimer Strasse 20
D-60487 Frankfurt am Main / DE
04 / SCHMITZER, Heidrun
König-Philipp-Weg 25
D-93051 Regensburg / DE
[2000/34]
Application number, filing date99926453.428.05.1999
[2000/34]
WO1999EP03689
Priority number, dateDE199812680216.06.1998         Original published format: DE 19826802
[2000/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9966641
Date:23.12.1999
Language:DE
[1999/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1029394
Date:23.08.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1999
[2000/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1029394
Date:27.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/13]
Search report(s)International search reportEP23.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H03K3/84, G06F7/58
[2000/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/34]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER ZUFALLSZAHL AUF QUANTENMECHANISCHER GRUNDLAGE UND ZUFALLSGENERATOR[2000/34]
English:METHOD FOR GENERATING A RANDOM NUMBER ON A QUANTUM-MECHANICS BASIS AND RANDOM GENERATOR[2000/34]
French:PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UN NOMBRE ALEATOIRE SELON DES PRINCIPES DE MECANIQUE QUANTIQUE, ET GENERATEUR ALEATOIRE[2000/34]
Entry into regional phase16.03.2000National basic fee paid 
23.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
23.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
04.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.01.2002Fee for grant paid
11.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI27.03.2002
GR27.03.2002
IE27.03.2002
IT27.03.2002
NL27.03.2002
AT28.05.2002
LU28.05.2002
MC28.05.2002
BE31.05.2002
CY31.05.2002
DK27.06.2002
PT27.06.2002
SE27.06.2002
ES25.09.2002
[2008/18]
Former [2004/39]FI27.03.2002
GR27.03.2002
IE27.03.2002
NL27.03.2002
AT28.05.2002
LU28.05.2002
MC28.05.2002
BE31.05.2002
CY31.05.2002
DK27.06.2002
PT27.06.2002
SE27.06.2002
ES25.09.2002
Former [2004/10]FI27.03.2002
GR27.03.2002
IE27.03.2002
NL27.03.2002
AT28.05.2002
MC28.05.2002
BE31.05.2002
CY31.05.2002
DK27.06.2002
PT27.06.2002
SE27.06.2002
ES25.09.2002
Former [2004/05]FI27.03.2002
GR27.03.2002
IE27.03.2002
NL27.03.2002
AT28.05.2002
MC28.05.2002
BE31.05.2002
DK27.06.2002
PT27.06.2002
SE27.06.2002
ES25.09.2002
Former [2003/48]FI27.03.2002
GR27.03.2002
IE27.03.2002
NL27.03.2002
AT28.05.2002
MC28.05.2002
BE31.05.2002
DK27.06.2002
PT27.06.2002
SE27.06.2002
Former [2003/47]FI27.03.2002
GR27.03.2002
IE27.03.2002
NL27.03.2002
AT28.05.2002
MC28.05.2002
DK27.06.2002
PT27.06.2002
SE27.06.2002
Former [2003/46]FI27.03.2002
GR27.03.2002
IE27.03.2002
NL27.03.2002
MC28.05.2002
DK27.06.2002
PT27.06.2002
SE27.06.2002
Former [2003/25]FI27.03.2002
GR27.03.2002
IE27.03.2002
NL27.03.2002
MC28.05.2002
PT27.06.2002
SE27.06.2002
Former [2003/21]FI27.03.2002
GR27.03.2002
IE27.03.2002
NL27.03.2002
PT27.06.2002
SE27.06.2002
Former [2003/19]FI27.03.2002
GR27.03.2002
IE27.03.2002
NL27.03.2002
SE27.06.2002
Former [2003/17]FI27.03.2002
IE27.03.2002
NL27.03.2002
SE27.06.2002
Former [2003/10]FI27.03.2002
NL27.03.2002
SE27.06.2002
Former [2002/49]FI27.03.2002
SE27.06.2002
Former [2002/37]SE27.06.2002
Cited inInternational search[AD]DE19641754  (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE])
 [AD]  - RARITY J G ET AL, "QUANTUM RANDOM-NUMBER GENERATION AND KEY SHARING", JOURNAL OF MODERN OPTICS, (19941201), vol. 41, no. 12, pages 2435 - 2444, XP002052913

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/09500349414552281