Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1091982

EP1091982 - PROCESS FOR MAKING ALLYLIC/ETHYLENIC COPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.06.2005
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ARCO Chemical Technology, L.P.
Two Greenville Crossing, 4001 Kennett Pike, Suite 238
Greenville, Delaware 19807 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/16]For all designated states
ARCO Chemical Technology, L.P.
Two Greenville Crossing, 4001 Kennett Pike, Suite 238
Greenville, Delaware 19807 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GUO, Shao, Hua
316 Horizon CT
Exton, PA 19431 / US
 [2001/39]
Former [2001/16]01 / GUO, Shao, Hua
1109 Greenhill Road
West Chester, PA 19380 / US
Representative(s)Colmer, Stephen Gary , et al
Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2SQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/08]Colmer, Stephen Gary , et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Former [2001/16]Bradley, Josephine Mary , et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date99926466.628.05.1999
[2001/16]
WO1999EP03718
Priority number, dateUS1998008825101.06.1998         Original published format: US 88251
[2001/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9962969
Date:09.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1091982
Date:18.04.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999
[2001/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1091982
Date:28.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08F16/08, C08F16/20, C08F26/02, C08F18/12, C08F18/24
[2001/16]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2001/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ALLYL-/ETHYLENISCHEN COPOLYMERISATEN[2001/16]
English:PROCESS FOR MAKING ALLYLIC/ETHYLENIC COPOLYMERS[2001/16]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE COPOLYMERES ALLYLIQUES/ETHYLENIQUES[2001/16]
Entry into regional phase23.10.2000National basic fee paid 
23.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
23.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/16]
24.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2004Fee for grant paid
09.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE28.07.2004
IT28.07.2004
SE28.10.2004
ES08.11.2004
[2008/18]
Former [2005/28]BE28.07.2004
SE28.10.2004
ES08.11.2004
Former [2005/23]SE28.10.2004
ES08.11.2004
Former [2005/10]SE28.10.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0432391  (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-5 * * example 1 *;
 [A]US4476252  (ESSELBORN EBERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-8 * * example 1 *;
 [A]US5382642  (GUO SHAO-HUA [US]) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-6 * * example 1 *;
 [A]US5369133  (IHM SON-KI [KR], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 2, lines 58,59 * * column 3, lines 2-6 * * column 6, lines 1-25 *;
 [A]US5338816  (RAMESH MANIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * claim 1 * * example 1 *