Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1084010

EP1084010 - METHOD FOR DRIVING AN ELECTRIC SCREWING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2004Revocation of patentpublished on 07.04.2004  [2004/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cooper Power Tools GmbH & Co.
Industriestrasse 1
73461 Westhausen / DE
[2001/12]
Inventor(s)01 / STÖLZLE, Konrad
Fünfkirchenerstrasse 14
D-73463 Westhausen / DE
02 / KAMINSKI, Ulrich
Albuchweg 14
D-73566 Bartholomä / DE
 [2001/12]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/12]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99926490.631.05.1999
[2001/12]
WO1999EP03772
Priority number, dateDE199812449502.06.1998         Original published format: DE 19824495
[2001/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9962675
Date:09.12.1999
Language:DE
[1999/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1084010
Date:21.03.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999
[2001/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1084010
Date:30.10.2002
Language:DE
[2002/44]
Search report(s)International search reportEP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B25B23/147, H02P7/29
[2001/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/12]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ANTREIBEN EINER ELEKTRISCHEN SCHRAUBVORRICHTUNG[2001/12]
English:METHOD FOR DRIVING AN ELECTRIC SCREWING DEVICE[2001/12]
French:PROCEDE D'ENTRAINEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF DE VISSAGE ELECTRIQUE[2001/12]
Entry into regional phase29.11.2000National basic fee paid 
29.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
29.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.11.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/12]
12.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2002Fee for grant paid
10.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.07.2003   
Metabowerke GmbH & Co.
Metabo-Allee
72622 Nürtingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Thielking & Elbertzhagen
Gadderbaumer Strasse 14
33602 Bielefeld / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2003/38]
Opponent(s)01  23.07.2003   
Metabowerke GmbH & Co.
Metabo-Allee
72622 Nürtingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Bodo Thielking Dipl.-Ing. Otto Elbertzhagen
Gadderbaumer Strasse 14
33602 Bielefeld / DE
04.09.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.10.2003Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.11.2003Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
16.11.2003Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200204   M06   Fee paid on   26.08.2002
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0633095  (EMHART INC [US]) [X] 1,3,4,7,10,13 * the whole document * [Y] 16;
 [A]EP0808018  (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [A] * abstract *;
 [A]EP0642891  (ATLAS COPCO TOOLS AB [SE]) [A] * abstract *;
 [Y]EP0755755  (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [Y] 16 * abstract *