Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1102762

EP1102762 - 2-SUBSTITUTED-1-PIPERIDYL BENZIMIDAZOLE COMPOUNDS AS ORL1-RECEPTOR AGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.09.2003
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfizer Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
PFIZER INC.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, N.Y. 10017 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ITO, Fumitaka, Pfizer Pharmaceuticals Inc.
CentralRes. Nagoya, 2, Aza 5-gochi, Taketoyo-cho
Chita-gun-gun, Aichi-ken 470-2393 / JP
02 / NOGUCHI, Hirohide, Pfizer Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Cenral Res. Nagoya, 2, Aza 5-gochi, Taketoyo-cho
Chita-gun, Aichi-ken 470-2393 / JP
03 / KONDO, Hiroshi, Pfizer Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Central Res. Nagoya, 2, Aza 5-gochi, Taketoyo-cho
Chita-un, Aichi-ken 470-2393 / JP
 [2001/22]
Representative(s)Hayles, James Richard
Pfizer
ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]Hayles, James Richard
Pfizer Limited, Patents Department, Ramsgate Road
Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
Application number, filing date99926688.505.07.1999
[2001/22]
WO1999IB01239
Priority number, dateWO1998IB0120606.08.1998         Original published format: PCT/IB98/01206
[2001/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0008013
Date:17.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1102762
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000
[2001/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1102762
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07D401/04, A61K31/445, C07D401/14, C07D211/58
[2001/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/22]
Extension statesAL26.01.2001
LT26.01.2001
LV26.01.2001
MK26.01.2001
RO26.01.2001
SI26.01.2001
TitleGerman:2-SUBSTITUIERTE-1-PIPERIDYL-BENZIMIDAZOLVERBINDUNGEN ALS ORL1 REZEPTOR AGONISTEN[2001/22]
English:2-SUBSTITUTED-1-PIPERIDYL BENZIMIDAZOLE COMPOUNDS AS ORL1-RECEPTOR AGONISTS[2001/22]
French:COMPOSES DE 1-PIPERIDYL BENZIMIDAZOLE SUBSTITUE EN 2, AGONISTES DU RECEPTEUR ORL1[2002/02]
Former [2001/22]COMPOS S DE 1-PIP RIDYL BENZIMIDAZOLE SUBSTITU EN 2, AGONISTES DU R CEPTEUR ORL1
Entry into regional phase26.01.2001National basic fee paid 
26.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/22]
11.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
16.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
11.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.08.2002Fee for grant paid
14.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMC31.07.2003
[2005/02]
Cited inInternational search[A]US3318900  (JAN JANSSEN PAUL ADRIAAN) [A] 1,9 * column 1 *;
 [DA]WO9740035  (NEUROSEARCH AS [DK], et al) [DA] 1,9 * claim - *