Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1036863

EP1036863 - METHOD FOR SYNTHESIZING N-TYPE DIAMOND HAVING LOW RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.07.2006
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Japan Science and Technology Agency
1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi
Saitama 332-0012 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/35]For all designated states
Japan Science and Technology Agency
1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi
Saitama 332-0012 / JP
Former [2004/15]For all designated states
Japan Science and Technology Agency
1-8, Honcho 4-chome
Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama 332-0012 / JP
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
Japan Science and Technology Corporation
4-1-8 Hon-cho
Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama-ken 332-0012 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YOSHIDA, Hiroshi
2-82-4, Daiwahigashi
Kawanishi-shi Hyogo 666-0111 / JP
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/38]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing.
Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99926801.424.06.1999
[2000/38]
WO1999JP03383
Priority number, dateJP1998020861107.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20861198
[2000/38]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0001867
Date:13.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1036863
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1036863
Date:31.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.01.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:C30B29/04, C30B25/02, C30B33/00, H01J1/34, H01J9/12, B01J3/06
[2002/47]
Former International [2002/06]C30B29/04, C23C16/27, C30B25/02, C30B23/02
Former International [2000/38]C30B29/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/38]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DIAMANTEN DES N-TYPS MIT NIEDRIGEM WIDERSTAND[2000/38]
English:METHOD FOR SYNTHESIZING N-TYPE DIAMOND HAVING LOW RESISTANCE[2000/38]
French:PROCEDE DE SYNTHESE DE DIAMANT DE TYPE N A FAIBLE RESISTANCE[2000/38]
Entry into regional phase08.03.2000Translation filed 
07.03.2000National basic fee paid 
07.03.2000Search fee paid 
28.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
22.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.05.2005Fee for grant paid
02.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
29.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US5051785  (BEETZ JR CHARLES P [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 10 *;
 [X]DE19653124  (NAT INST RES INORGANIC MAT [JP]) [X] 1-3 * claims 1-5 *;
 [X]GB2228949  (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 2 - page 3 *;
 [X]JPH07300395  ;
 [Y]EP0512429  (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 5 * page 2, line 1 - line 30 *;
 [A]EP0829898  (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [A] 5 * claim - *;
 [A]JPH06214030
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 1996, no. 03, & JP07300395 A 19951114 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 4 * abstract *
 [Y]  - BEETZ ETAL C P, "Applications of diamond films to photocathode electron guns and accelerators", PROCEEDINGS OF THE PARTICLE ACCELERATOR CONFERENCE. SAN FRANCISCO, MAY 6 - 9, 1991, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19910506), vol. 3 CONF. 14, ISBN 0-7803-0135-8, pages 1981 - 1983, XP002154667 [Y] 5 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941107), vol. 018, no. 581, Database accession no. (P - 1822), & JP06214030 A 19940805 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND LTD) [A] 6 * abstract *
International search[AP]JPH10247624  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND);
 [A]JPH06214030  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES);
 [A]JPS6270295  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES)
Examination   - NISHIMORI T. ET AL, "n-type high-conductive epitaxial diamond film prepared by gas source molecular beam epitaxy with methane and tri-n-butylphosphine", APPL. PHYS. LETT., (19970818), vol. 71, no. 7, pages 945 - 947