Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1083969

EP1083969 - IRRADIATION CATHETER WITH EXPANDABLE SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.04.2009
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.04.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.05.2009  [2009/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Teirstein, Paul S.
1515 Coast Walk
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
[2001/12]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/12]
Representative(s)Robertson, James Alexander , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Robertson, James Alexander , et al
Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2005/43]Robertson, James Alexander , et al
Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre
GB-London WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2001/12]Jacob, Reuben Ellis
Edward Evans & Co., Clifford's Inn, Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BX / GB
Application number, filing date99927159.602.06.1999
[2001/12]
WO1999US12245
Priority number, dateUS1998008884002.06.1998         Original published format: US 88840
[2001/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9962598
Date:09.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1083969
Date:21.03.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999
[2001/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1083969
Date:28.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.12.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61N5/10
[2007/48]
Former International [2001/12]A61N5/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/12]
TitleGerman:BESTRAHLUNGSKATHETER MIT EXPANDIERBARER QUELLE[2001/12]
English:IRRADIATION CATHETER WITH EXPANDABLE SOURCE[2001/12]
French:CATHETER D'IRRADIATION A SOURCE EXTENSIBLE[2001/12]
Entry into regional phase14.12.2000National basic fee paid 
14.12.2000Search fee paid 
14.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
14.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
14.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/12]
16.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.10.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.11.2007
26.10.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
22.11.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
29.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2008Fee for grant paid
08.04.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
14.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9622121  (HEHRLEIN CHRISTOPH [DE]) [X] 1-3,9-19,21 * page 5 - page 7 *;
 [X]US5484384  (FEARNOT NEAL E [US]) [X] 1-3,8,10-18 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5411466  (HESS ROBERT L [US]) [X] 1-6,9-11 * the whole document * * column 3, line 41 - line 59; figures 2,4 *;
 [X]WO9718012  (LOCALMED INC [US]) [X] 1-6,8,10,11 * page 21, line 13 - page 24, line 36; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US5730698  (FISCHELL ROBERT E [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8,10,11 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 24; figures 3b,6 * * column 5, line 41 - line 65; figure 9 *
International search[XP]US5863284  (KLEIN ENRIQUE J [US])