Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1082686

EP1082686 - WORKFLOW SYNCHRONIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.05.2012
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.05.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.06.2012  [2012/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JDA Software Group, Inc.
14400 N.
87th Street
Scottsdale, AZ 85260-3649 / US
[2011/37]
Former [2001/11]For all designated states
i2 TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Suite 1600, 909 East Las Colinas Boulevard
Irving, TX 75039 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NOTANI, Ranjit, N.
1218 Hidden Ridge Drive 2070
Irving, TX 75038 / US
02 / WHIPPLE, Mark, B.
110 N. Clinton Avenue
Dallas, TX 75208 / US
03 / PARASNIS, Abhay, V.
107 Fleetwood Cove
Coppell TX 75019 / US
 [2001/19]
Former [2001/11]01 / NOTANI, Ranjit, N.
1218 Hidden Ridge Drive 2070
Irving, TX 75038 / US
02 / WHIPPLE, Mark, B.
110 N. Clinton Avenue
Dallas, TX 75208 / US
03 / PARASNIS, Abhay, V.
8804 Saddlehorn Drive 2070
Irving, TX 75063 / US
Representative(s)Gosnall, Toby , et al
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham
B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/41]Gosnall, Toby , et al
Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham
B16 8QQ / GB
Former [2001/11]Lawrence, John , et al
Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date99927188.503.06.1999
[2001/11]
WO1999US12351
Priority number, dateUS1998009234805.06.1998         Original published format: US 92348
US1998015633318.09.1998         Original published format: US 156333
[2001/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9963470
Date:09.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1082686
Date:14.03.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999
[2001/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[2001/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/11]
TitleGerman:ARBEITSFLUSS-SYNCHRONISATION[2001/11]
English:WORKFLOW SYNCHRONIZATION[2001/11]
French:SYNCHRONISATION DES FLUX DE TRAVAUX[2001/11]
Entry into regional phase22.12.2000National basic fee paid 
22.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/11]
18.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.12.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/26]
07.02.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/26]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.09.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
17.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
10.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
12.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
16.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
23.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
19.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
19.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200204   M06   Fee paid on   17.10.2002
30.06.201113   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[PXA]WO9910825  (I2 TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [PX] 1-4,7,9-12,15 * page 23, line 17 - page 28, line 25 * [PA] 5,6,8,13,14,16;
 [YA]WO9808177  (I2 TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [Y] 1-4,7,9-12,15 * abstract * * page 5, line 1 - page 14, line 5 * [A] 5,6,8,13,14,16;
 [A]EP0778535  (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 3, column 3, line 12 - page 9, column 16, line 9 *;
 [YA]  - BARBUCEANU M ET AL, "Coordinating multiple agents in the supply chain", DSP THE ENABLING TECHNOLOGY FOR COMMUNICATIONS. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, (19960101), pages 134 - 141, XP002090170 [Y] 1-4,7,9-12,15 * abstract * * page 134, column 1, line 26 - page 135, column 2, line 1 * * page 136, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 138, column 1, line 2 * [A] 5,6,8,13,14,16
 [A]  - FU-REN LIN ET AL, "Modeling supply-chain networks by a multi-agent system", PROCEEDINGS OF THE HAWAII INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYSTEM SCIENCES, (19980101), vol. 5, pages 105 - 114, XP002090171 [A] 1-16 * page 107, column 2, line 26 - page 110, column 2, line 34 * * page 111, column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 40 *