Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1101251

EP1101251 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SUPPLYING HYDROGEN FOR USE IN FUEL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.07.2006
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.08.2006  [2006/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
3225 Gallows Road
Fairfax, VA 22037 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/44]For all designated states
EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION
3225 Gallows Road
Fairfax, VI 22037-0001 / US
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
MOBIL OIL CORPORATION
3225 Gallows Road
Fairfax, Virginia 22037-0001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LAPIERRE, Rene, B.
43 Arrowhead Court
Medford, NJ 08055-8340 / US
02 / PARTRIDGE, Randall, D.
229 Mountwell Avenue
Haddonfield, NJ 08033 / US
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Dew, Melvyn John , et al
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
IP Law Europe
Hermeslaan 2
1831 Machelen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]Dew, Melvyn John , et al
Exxon Chemical Europe Inc. Law Technology P.O.Box 105
1830 Machelen / BE
Application number, filing date99927311.308.06.1999
[2001/21]
WO1999US12737
Priority number, dateUS19980088627P09.06.1998         Original published format: US 88627 P
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9965097
Date:16.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1101251
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.1999
[2001/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US16.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/06, C01B3/34, C01B3/38, C01B3/50
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/21]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZUFÜHREN VON WASSERSTOFF ZUR VERWENDUNG IN BRENNSTOFFZELLEN[2001/21]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SUPPLYING HYDROGEN FOR USE IN FUEL CELLS[2001/21]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'APPORT D'HYDROGENE POUR CELLULES ELECTROCHIMIQUES[2001/21]
Entry into regional phase22.12.2000National basic fee paid 
22.12.2000Search fee paid 
22.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/21]
03.01.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/34]
20.02.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
04.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200507   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH0757758  (NGK INSULATORS LTD);
 [Y]US5030661  (LYWOOD WARWICK J [GB]);
 [Y]US4553981  (FUDERER ANDRIJA [BE]);
 [YP]JPH11116202  (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND);
 [YP]US5897970  (ISOMURA MANABU [JP], et al);
 [X]US5417051  (ANKERSMIT JAN H [NL], et al);
 [A]US3955941  (HOUSEMAN JOHN, et al);
 [A]US4788004  (PINTO ALWYN [GB], et al)