Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1091645

EP1091645 - BURNABLE COIL HOLDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 03.11.2004  [2004/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
S.C. JOHNSON & SON, INC.
1525 Howe Street Racine
Wisconsin 53403 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
S.C. JOHNSON & SON, INC.
1525 Howe Street
Racine, Wisconsin 53403 / US
Former [2001/16]For all designated states
S.C.JOHNSON & SON, INC.
1525 Howe Street
Racine, WI 53403-5226 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CAREY, Michael, R.
5642 Glenwood Drive
Racine, WI 53406 / US
02 / FURNER, Paul, E.
3400 Orion Court
Racine, WI 53406 / US
03 / HILDEBRANDT, Donald, W.
5107 - 57th Drive
Sturtevant, WI 53177 / US
04 / MAJEROWSKI, Amelia, H.
8971 - 33rd Avenue
Kenosha, WI 53142 / US
05 / PETERSEN, Russell, H.
3825 S. Highway 41
Sturtevant, WI 53177 / US
 [2001/16]
Representative(s)Ruschke, Hans Edvard , et al
Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen
Postfach 86 06 29
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/16]Ruschke, Hans Edvard, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Ruschke Hartmann Becker Pienzenauerstrasse 2
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date99927467.310.06.1999
[2001/16]
WO1999US13196
Priority number, dateUS1998010943902.07.1998         Original published format: US 109439
[2001/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0001230
Date:13.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1091645
Date:18.04.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000
[2001/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1091645
Date:12.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/11]
Search report(s)International search reportEP13.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:A01M1/20, A01M13/00, A61L9/03
[2001/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/16]
TitleGerman:HALTER EINER BRENNBAREN SPIRALE[2002/34]
English:BURNABLE COIL HOLDER[2001/16]
French:SUPPORT POUR BOBINE COMBUSTIBLE[2002/34]
Former [2001/16]BRENNBAR WICKELHALTER
Former [2001/16]SUPPORT POUR SERPENTIN COMBUSTIBLE
Entry into regional phase05.01.2001National basic fee paid 
05.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
05.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/16]
08.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2002Fee for grant paid
25.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.03.2003
BE12.03.2003
CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
IE10.06.2003
LU10.06.2003
DK12.06.2003
GB12.06.2003
SE12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
[2004/45]
Former [2004/39]AT12.03.2003
BE12.03.2003
CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
IE10.06.2003
LU10.06.2003
DK12.06.2003
SE12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
Former [2004/29]AT12.03.2003
BE12.03.2003
CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
IE10.06.2003
DK12.06.2003
SE12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
Former [2004/23]AT12.03.2003
BE12.03.2003
CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
DK12.06.2003
SE12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
Former [2004/10]AT12.03.2003
BE12.03.2003
CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
SE12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
Former [2003/50]AT12.03.2003
CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
SE12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
Former [2003/47]AT12.03.2003
CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
PT16.06.2003
Former [2003/43]CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
PT16.06.2003
Former [2003/41]CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
Former [2003/40]CH12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]FR909302  (ASEPTA LAB) [A] 1,9,10,15,16 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US3796002  (KATSUDA Y) [DA] 1,9,10,15,16 * figure -; claim - *;
 [DA]US4126958  (YOKOYAMA YOSHIMASA) [DA] 1,9,10,15,16 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]GB2276547  (HOO SIEW KHUAN [MY]) [A] 1,15,16 * figure -; claim - *
by applicantUS3796002
 US4126958
 US4765090
 US5657574