EP1074030 - SWITCHING DEVICE WITH INTERRUPTER CHAMBER MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.2003 [2003/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIEBLER, Ludwig Erzgebirgstrasse 8 D-93164 Laaber / DE | 02 /
STRASSBURGER, Michael Steinäcker 1A D-92266 Ensdorf / DE | [2001/06] | Application number, filing date | 99927662.9 | 14.04.1999 | [2001/06] | WO1999DE01116 | Priority number, date | DE1998118058 | 22.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19818058 | [2001/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9954897 | Date: | 28.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1074030 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1074030 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01H1/20 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
H01H1/2008 (EP,US);
H01H9/345 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2001/06] | Title | German: | SCHALTGERÄT MIT EINER SCHALTKAMMER-BAUGRUPPE | [2001/06] | English: | SWITCHING DEVICE WITH INTERRUPTER CHAMBER MODULE | [2001/06] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMUTATION COMPORTANT UN MODULE A CHAMBRE DE COUPURE | [2001/06] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.04.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 23.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE1230893 (BUSCH JAEGER DUERENER METALL) [Y] 1 * column 3 - column 4; figure 1 *; | [A]US3436497 (MADING JAMES E) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0049550 (HOLLANDSE APPARATENFAB [NL]); | [Y]DE3446870 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1 * figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US4684772 (LEHMAN LEWIS M [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * |