Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991534

EP0991534 - RUBBER-CUSHIONED BALL JOINT WITH A BEARING GEOMETRY WHICH IS OPTIMIZED WITH REGARD TO TENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.08.2003  [2003/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZF Lemförder Metallwaren AG
49448 Lemförde / DE
[2000/29]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
LEMFOERDER METALLWAREN AG.
Postfach 1220
49441 Lemförde / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KAMMEL, Helmut
Taubenschlag 2
D-49401 Damme / DE
02 / SICHLER, Axel
Bramscherstrasse 66
D-49492 Westerkappeln / DE
[2000/15]
Application number, filing date99927697.521.04.1999
[2000/15]
WO1999DE01200
Priority number, dateDE199811816123.04.1998         Original published format: DE 19818161
DE199813295622.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19832956
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9955543
Date:04.11.1999
Language:DE
[1999/44]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0991534
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991534
Date:04.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60G1/00
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:GUMMIGELAGERTES KUGELGELENK MIT SPANNUNGSOPTIMIERTER LAGERGEOMETRIE[2000/15]
English:RUBBER-CUSHIONED BALL JOINT WITH A BEARING GEOMETRY WHICH IS OPTIMIZED WITH REGARD TO TENSION[2000/15]
French:JOINT A ROTULE MONTE DANS UN PALIER EN CAOUTCHOUC, PRESENTANT UNE GEOMETRIE DE PALIER OPTIMISEE EN CE QUI CONCERNE LES TENSIONS[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase20.10.1999National basic fee paid 
20.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
04.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2002Fee for grant paid
25.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US3843272  (JORN R) [A] 1,2 * column 7, lines 29-51; figure 5 *;
 [A]FR2634839  (CHEVALLIER ANDRE [FR]) [A] 1,5 * page 3, lines 4-30; figure 6 *;
 [DA]DE2838391  (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG) [DA] 1-3,6,9 * figure 5 *;
 [DA]DE8620178U  (LEMFÖRDER METALLWAREN AG) [DA] 1,8,10 * page 4, lines 4-30; figure 1 *;
 [A]FR2649171  (IRIGNY MECANIQUE [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *